Brown v. Russell
Petitioner: Deraughn Brown
Respondent: Terry Russell
Case Number: 4:2013cv01515
Filed: August 1, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Deraughn Browns Amended Application for a COA (Doc. 95 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/13/18. (JAB)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Deraughn Browns Application for a COA (Doc. 87 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/29/18. (JAB)
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 79 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Deraughn Brown's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (Doc. 1 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Entry of Final Resolution (Doc. 72 ), is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/30/2018. (CLO)
October 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Leave to Appeal in Forma Pauperis (Doc. 40 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 10/28/2016. (CLO)
September 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Deraughn Browns Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 (Doc. 1 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, because Petitioner cannot make a substantial showin g of the denial of a constitutional right, the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. See Cox v. Norris, 133 F.3d 565, 569 (8th Cir. 1997). A judgment dismissing this case is filed herewith. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/30/16. (JAB)
October 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Deraughn Brown's Motion Requesting Permission to Submit Supplement Reply Brief (Doc. 17 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's motion entitled "Consideration of Evidentiary Hearing" (Doc. 18 ) is DENIED, without prejudice.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/2/15. (KKS)
May 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 14 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Quash Stay-And-Abeyance Procedure (Doc. 14 ) is GRANTED. Petitioners Motion entitled, Stay-And-Abeyance Procedure (Doc. 13 ) is hereby withdrawn. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/6/15. (ARL)
March 27, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Evidentiary Hearing (Doc. 11 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/27/15. (ARL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Deraughn Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Terry Russell
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?