Lindsey v. Jackson et al
Plaintiff: |
Jackie Lindsey |
Defendant: |
Charles Gamble, Carmen S. McClendon, Kenneth Williams, Village of Uplands Park, Herbert Jackson, Henry Iwenofu and Shirley Martin |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv01797 |
Filed: |
September 13, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Ross |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 10, 2014 |
Filing
53
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendan's Herbert Jackson, Village of Uplands Park, Kenneth Williams, Carmen S. McClendon, Henry Iwenofu, Shirley Martin's Motion for Pretrial Conference 49 is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED , in part. The Court denies Defendants' untimely request for leave to conduct an independent medical examination of Plaintiff. The Court grants Defendants leave to depose Plaintiffs other two disclosed experts. Plaintiff shall produce her two experts on a date agreed upon by counsel. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/10/14. (JWD)
|
May 2, 2014 |
Filing
48
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, within 60 days of the filing of the Suggestion of Death, Plaintiff shall file either: an objection to the validity of the Suggestion of Death; a motion for substitution of Defendant Martin, indicating the party to be substituted; or a stipulation to the dismissal of Defendant Martin from this action. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/2/14. (JWD)
|
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
31
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Village of Upland Park's Motion for Additional Extension of Time to Comply with Court Order 30 is GRANTED. Defense counsel's request to withdraw is granted. Defendant Village of Upland Park is granted until April 23, 2014 to find new representation and to respond to Plaintiffs Second Request for Production of Documents.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/25/14. (LGK)
|
March 7, 2014 |
Filing
27
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant Village of Upland Parks Responses to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents 25 is GRANTED. Uplands Park shall supplement its responses to Plaintiff's Second Request for Production of Documents within seven (7) days of the date of this Order.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/7/14. (LGK)
|
December 17, 2013 |
Filing
19
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Partially Dismiss Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Complaint 5 is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Count II of Plaintiff's Fourth Amended Petition is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs Fourth Amended Complaint 10 is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/17/13. (ARL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?