Hankins v. Russell et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Hankins
Defendant: Terry Russell, Corizon Medical Services, Inc., Tonya M. Long, Marvin H. Bohnenkamp and Mark F. Bradshaw
Case Number: 4:2013cv01999
Filed: October 3, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 147 MOTION for the court to order subpoenas, writs of habeas corpus and or subpoena duces tecum to these witnesses to give testimony at trial filed by Plaintiff Ronnie Hankins - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall prepare subpoenas for those witnesses for whom Plaintiff has provided an address. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshals Service shall serve said subpoenas upon said witnesses. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 9/1/17. (KJS)
April 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal [ECF No. 116 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $7.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding.( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 5/30/2015.). Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 04/13/2015. (CLK)
February 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 109 OPINION MEMORANDUM - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Corizon Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 65 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Russells Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 70 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 87 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Corizon Defendants Motion to Strike Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 89 ] is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that Plaintiffs Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum [Doc. No. 105 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Stay [Doc. No. 108 ] is DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Shanta Pribble, David Mullen, Todd Renshaw, Ernest Jackson, Joe Hoffmeister, and Stan Jackson are DISMISSED. An appropriate Judgment and Order of Partial Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/26/15. (KJS)
January 16, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 18 ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss [Doc. #18] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 1/16/14. (CEL)
October 10, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 2 ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in formapauperis [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $68.90 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. FU RTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to pay the initial partial filing fee within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, then this case will be dismissed without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the unidentified John Doe defendants are DISMISSE D from this action without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint. FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to 42 U.S.C. § 1997e(g)(2), defendants shall reply to plaintiff's claims within the time provided by the applicable provisions of Rule 12(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is assigned to Track 5B: Prisoner Standard. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 10/10/13. (CEL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hankins v. Russell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry Russell
Represented By: Joel A. Poole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tonya M. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marvin H. Bohnenkamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark F. Bradshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?