Andrews v. Schafer et al
Plaintiff: Dwayne Andrews
Defendant: H. A. Mannich, Sylvia P. Adams, Laurent D. Javois, Mark Stringer, Felix T. Vincenz, Keith Schafer and Roy Wilson
Case Number: 4:2013cv02045
Filed: October 11, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Henry E. Autrey
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPINION,MEMORANDUM AND ORDER-- HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 2 ] is GRANTED. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a). FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for admission pro hac vice ofplaintiff's at torney, Mr. Beau B. Brindley, [Doc. # 10 ] is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the first amended complaint as to defendants Keith Schafer, Felix T.Vincenz, Mark Stringer, Laurent D. Javois, Sy lvia P.Adams,H.A. Mannich, and Roy Wilson in their individual capacities. FURTHER ORDERED that, as to defendants "as-of-yet Unknown Employees," the Clerk shall not issue process or cause process to issue, because the amended complaint is le gally frivolous and fails to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). A separate Order of Partial Dismissal shall accompany this Memorandumand Order. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 01/30/2014. (CLK)
December 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 6 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. #5] is DENIED, without prejudice. 5 Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 12/4/13. (CLA)
November 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 4 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to plaintiff a copy of the Courts form Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, consistent with this Order, plaintiff shallfile an amended complaint on the Court-provided form within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order; plaintiff shall not attach a memorandum of law to the amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, Response to Court due by 12/25/2013. Signed by District Judge Henry E. Autrey on 11/25/13. cc: prisoner civil right complaint mailed to petitioner.(CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andrews v. Schafer et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H. A. Mannich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sylvia P. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurent D. Javois
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Stringer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felix T. Vincenz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Schafer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dwayne Andrews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?