October 7, 2016 |
Filing
113
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Bill of Costs [ECF No. 82 ] is GRANTED and Plaintiffs shall be awarded $905.00 in clerk fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion f or Attorneys Fees [ECF No. 83 ] is GRANTED in Part, and DENIED in Part. Plaintiffs shall be awarded $187,465.70 in attorneys' fees costs and $161.05 in costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Disclosure of Billi ng Records [ECF No. 85 ] is MOOT since Defendants have provided these records. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Verified Joint Motion for Supplemental Award of Attorneys' Fees Pursuant to U.S.C. § 1988. [ECF No. 111 ] is GRANTED in Part, and Denied in Part. Plaintiffs shall be awarded an additional $6,423.60 in attorneys' fees. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/7/2016. (CBL)
|
September 15, 2016 |
Filing
108
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Darlene Green, Tishaura O. Jones, and Francis G. Slays Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment and Attorneys Fees is hereby GRANTED 89 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the execution of Judgment and payment of attorneys fees and costs in this matter is stayed, and the requirement of filing a bond is waived. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 9/15/16. (CAR)
|
July 25, 2016 |
Filing
81
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED in PART and DENIED in part. [ECF No. 58 ]; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiffs' judgment against Officer Williams in his official Capacity is a judgment against the City Defendants; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED City of Saint Louis is not required to pay post-judgment interest. [ECF No. 49 -13]; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED a writ of mandamus be directed to Darlene Green, Comptrolle r of the City of Saint Louis, ordering her to pay the Judgment of $1,487,553.49 to Plaintiffs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendants Bettye Battle-Turner, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Francis G. Slay, and Erwin O. Switzer's Motion for Summary Jud gment [ECF No. 53 ] is DENIED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Darlene Green, Tishaura O. Jones, and Francis G. Slay's Motion for Summary Judgment [ECF No. 56 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 7/25/2016. (CBL)
|
March 25, 2014 |
Filing
29
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Slay, Green, and Jones' Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 13] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants[ Slay, Gray, Irwin, Battle-Turner, and Switzer's] Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 18] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all claims against Defendants Francis Slay, Darlene Green, Tishaura Jones, Richard Gray, Thomas Irwin, Bettye Battle- Turner, and Erwin Switzer shall be DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on March 25, 2014. (MCB)
|
December 31, 2013 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to File a Responsive Pleading [ECF No. 11] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint in this matter no later than January 27, 2014. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on December 31, 2013. (BRP)
|