Mueller v. Barton et al.
Plaintiff: |
Lois Mueller |
Defendant: |
Consumer Adjustment Company, Inc., Dennis J. Barton, III, Roger Weiss and Senex Services Corp. |
Case Number: |
4:2013cv02523 |
Filed: |
December 19, 2013 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Nannette A. Baker |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 1692 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 22, 2014 |
Filing
75
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Barton's Motion for Additional Time to Respond to Plaintif's Request for Admissions Rule 36(a)(3), Fed. R. Civ. P., is GRANTED. [Doc. 71] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Barton shall serve his answers to plaintiff's Requests for Admissions by September 26, 2014 at 5:00 p.m.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 9/22/2014. (MRC)
|
September 12, 2014 |
Filing
64
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Barton's motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part;the motion is GRANTED as to plaintiff's FDCPA claims arising from the initial collection letter of October 22 , 2012, and DENIED as to the remaining FDCPA claims; the motion is DENIED as to the abuse of process claim and GRANTED as to the conversion claim.[Doc. 40] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff is granted leave to file a second amended complain t within ten(10) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, to replead the conversion claim if she elects to do so. Any amended complaint will completely replace the First Amended Complaint, and shall conform to all rulings contained in this Memo randum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Bartons Motion for Protective Order and to StayDiscovery is DENIED. [Doc. 58] An appropriate order of partial dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. If plaintiff does not file a second amended complaint as permitted herein, the Court will issue an amended order of partial dismissal to include the conversion claim.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 9/12/2014. (MRC)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?