Owens v. United States of America
Petitioner: Anthony Owens
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 4:2013cv02561
Filed: December 20, 2013
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movant's motion for relief from judgment under Rule 60(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 59 is denied. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 3/28/2017. (CBL)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that movant's motion to withdraw [# 38 ] is granted and motion # 37 is deemed withdrawn. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movant's second motion to alter or amend judgment [# 39 ], his Supplemental Motion to alter or amend judgment [# 45 ] and his Motion of Bias or Prejudice [# 46 ] are denied. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 12/16/15. (EAB)
July 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the movant's motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions are denied. IT IS FUR THERED ORDERED that this Court will not issue a certificate of appealability because Owens has not made a substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right. A separate judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 07/08/2015. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Owens v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Anthony Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Dean J. Sauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?