Lutzeier v. Citigroup, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Fred E. Lutzeier
Defendant: Citigroup, Inc., Citigroup Management Corp., CitiMortgage, Inc. and Steve Champney
Case Number: 4:2014cv00183
Filed: January 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Rodney W. Sippel
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 209 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration of March 2, 2015 Order (ECF Nos. 160 , 172 ) is GRANTED. The Court's March 2, 2015 dismissing Plaintiffs First Cause of Action for Violation of 15 U.S.C. §78u-6(h)(l)(A) is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Documents Withheld Under Bank Examiner's Privilege (ECF No. 174 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall request the information through the admini strative procedures set forth in the regulations within twenty (20) days of the date of this order. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a proposed amended joint scheduling plan to govern any additional discovery required by the Court's rulings within ten (10) days, if necessary. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/19/2015. (NEB)
September 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 170 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiff's Motion for Additional Time for Deposition of Defendant Steve Champney ("Motion"; ECF No. 158 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/22/2015. (NEB)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiffs Amended Motion to Quash and/or Modify Subpoenas Duces Tecum and/or Motion for a Protective Order (ECF No. 114 ) is DENIED, in part, and GRANTED, in part. The subpoenas are quashed exc ept that Defendants are entitled to documents in Plaintiffs employment records related to Plaintiffs application for employment, any disciplinary documents or documents related to Plaintiffs termination of employment, performance evaluations, and documents reflecting Plaintiffs level (s) of compensation. In addition, Defendants can review any medical information in Plaintiffs employment file, excluding any medical information in the files of Plaintiffs former employers that is unrelated to either Plaintiffs mental health or other conditions that might inhibit his ability to work. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on April 22, 2015. (BRP)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Alter and/or Amend Order of March 2, 2015 to Certify Question for Interlocutory Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1292(b). (ECF No. 134 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on April 21, 2015. (BRP)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 133 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Defendants' Motion for Clarification of the Court's March 2, 2015 Memorandum and Order (ECF No. 131) and Partial Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike (ECF No. 46) are GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/9/15. (JWJ)
March 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 126 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Partially Unopposed Motion for Partial Reconsideration of February 2, 2015 Order and For an Extension of Time to Comply with Order (ECF No. 116 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, i n part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall provide a joint proposed amended case management order no later than March 6, 2015. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) ( Response to Court due by 3/6/2015.). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/3/2015. (NEB)
March 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 121 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint and Motion to Strike (ECF No. 46 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs First Cause of Action for Violation of 15 U.S.C. §78u-6 (h)(l)(A ) is DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike Defendants' Affirmative Defenses and Alternative Motion for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law in Support (ECF No. 53 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Defendants' Sixteenth Affirmative Defense and Defendants' "Reservation of Right to Amend" are STRICKEN. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 3/2/2015. (NEB)
February 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 119 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Strike, and/or in the Alternative, Motion for Additional Time to File a Response in Opposition to, Defendants Purported Partially Unopposed Motion for Partial Reconsideration of Febr uary 2, 2015 Order and for an Extension of Time to Comply with Order (ECF No. 117) is DENIED, in part, and GRANTED, in part. The Court will not strike Defendants Motion, but orders Plaintiff to file his response to Defendants Motion no later than February 27, 2015. Response to Court due by 2/27/2015. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/25/15. (JWJ)
February 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 113 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Partially Quash or Modify Subpoenas and/or for a Protective Order (ECF No. 111 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on February 17, 2015. (BRP)
February 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Compel Discovery (ECF No. 79) is DENIED, in part, and GRANTED, in part, in accordance with the discussion outlined above. The Court orders Defendants to supplement their document pr oduction within twenty (20) days, as outlined above, and to provide Plaintiff with a privilege log within sixty (60) days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Discovery (ECF No. 88) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 2/2/15. (JWJ)
January 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel Discovery (ECF No. 103 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 1/28/2015. (NEB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lutzeier v. Citigroup, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fred E. Lutzeier
Represented By: Joy D. McMillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup, Inc.
Represented By: Eric A. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citigroup Management Corp.
Represented By: Eric A. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CitiMortgage, Inc.
Represented By: Eric A. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Champney
Represented By: Eric A. Todd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?