Christian v. Commerce Bank N.A. et al
Plaintiff: |
Fred Christian |
Defendant: |
Commerce Bank N.A. and Jeannine Murphy |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv00201 |
Filed: |
February 4, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Nature of Suit: |
Banks and Banking |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 22, 2014 |
Filing
83
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 50) is GRANTED as follows: 1. Plaintiffs claim for individual discrimination against Defendant Commerce Bank is DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff shall have un til November 21, 2014, to amend his complaint to properly state a claim against the bank for individual discrimination under the ECOA. 2. Plaintiffs claim for red-lining, and Plaintiffs claims against Defendants Murphy and Bailey in their individual capacities, are DISMISSED withprejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants motion for a more definitestatement (Doc. No. 33), which was directed to Plaintiffs original complaint, is DENIED as moot. ( Response to Court due by 11/21/2014.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/22/14. (JWJ)
|
July 28, 2014 |
Filing
55
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's second motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice for the same reasons his previous motion for appointment of counsel was denied. (Doc. No. 53 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until August 4, 2014 to file a response to Defendants motion to dismiss (Doc. No. 50 ). (Please see Order for further details.). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/28/2014. (NEB)
|
June 23, 2014 |
Filing
45
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to respond to Defendants' motion for more definite statement is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as follows: (Doc. No. 44 .) a. Plaintiff is granted until July 3, 2014, to file a response to the pending motion for more definite statement, consistent with this Order, and b. Plaintiff's request to delay his response to the motion until such time as he identifies the underwriter/supe rvisor is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for appointment of a Court reporter is DENIED without prejudice. (Doc. No. 37 .) (Response to Court due by 7/3/2014.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on June 23, 2014. (BRP)
|
May 29, 2014 |
Filing
34
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for "exemption from pacer fees and to receive e-mail filings" is DENIED. (Doc. No. 25.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 27.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 5/29/2014. (NCL)
|
April 18, 2014 |
Filing
15
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel and for trial by jury is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth below: Doc. No. 4 . a. Plaintiffs motion for appointment of counsel is DENIED wit hout prejudice. b. Plaintiffs motion for jury trial is GRANTED, subject to the Courts future. reconsideration of the issue, as appropriate. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Doc. No. 6 . IT IS F URTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motions to compel are DENIED without prejudice. Doc. Nos. 7 & 8 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs request that the Clerk of Court email all electronically filed documents to him is GRANTED. Doc. No. 14 . IT I S FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before April 25, 2014, Plaintiff shall file his email address with the Court in typewritten or clearly legible handwritten format. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that upon receipt of Plaintiffs email address, the Clerk of Court shall take all steps necessary to assure that Plaintiff receives emailed copies of all filings in this case. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/18/2014. (RAK)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?