Johnson et al v. City of Hazelwood et al
Plaintiff: LaTasha Johnson, A.D.J., A.T.J., T.J.J. and T.F.W.
Defendant: City of Hazelwood, Hazelwood Police Department, Norman Mars, Danial Kenner and Jason Corson
Case Number: 4:2014cv00286
Filed: February 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: For the foregoing reasons, this Court finds the amount of the settlement agreement is fair and just and that the requirements of the Wrongful Death Statute have been satisfied in all other respects. Accordingly, the motion for approval is granted, and the parties are directed to submit a proposed formal judgment in accordance with these findings as soon as practicable. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/7/2017. (JMC)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss (case no. 4:14CV286, ECF #17) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part as set forth herein. The state law claims for negligent hiring and negligent supervision are DISMI SSED. The assault and battery claim is stricken and DISMISSED. Defendant Hazelwood Police Department is DISMISSED. In all other respects, the motion is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion to dismiss plaintiffs' second amended complaint (case no. 4:14CV1311, ECF #6) is GRANTED. The case is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the intervening plaintiffs' complaint (case no. 4:14CV1311) is DISMISSED. The motion to dismiss (ECF #8) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment (case no. 4:14CV1311, ECF #18) is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/22/2014. (JMC)
September 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Johnson, et al. v. City of Hazelwood, No. 4:14CV1311 (RLW) is consolidated with this action, Johnson, et al. v. City of Hazelwood, et al., No. 4:14CV286 (SNLJ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Johnson, et al . v. City of Hazelwood, No. 4:14CV1311 (RLW) shall be reassigned to the undersigned in accordance with E.D.Mo. L.R. 4.03. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that following consolidation all documents shall be filed in Johnson, et al. v. City of Hazelwood, et al., No. 4:14CV286 (SNLJ).. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/19/14. (MRS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson et al v. City of Hazelwood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LaTasha Johnson
Represented By: Michael Schwade
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.D.J.
Represented By: Michael Schwade
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.T.J.
Represented By: Michael Schwade
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.J.J.
Represented By: Michael Schwade
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T.F.W.
Represented By: Michael Schwade
Represented By: Albert S. Watkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Hazelwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazelwood Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman Mars
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danial Kenner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Corson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?