Smalley v. Lombardi
Plaintiff: James H. Smalley
Defendant: George A. Lombardi, Douglas Prudden, Matt Sturm, Richard Griggs and Robert Sherman
Case Number: 4:2014cv00386
Filed: February 24, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: DeKalb
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's "Motion to Show Cause" [Doc.# 21 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff is granted additional time, up to and including May 7, 2015, to pay the $3.32 initial appellate filing fee. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 4/10/15. (EAB)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall immediately pay an initial filing fee of $3.32. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an appellate proceeding. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 03/20/2015. (CBL)
August 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (see order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for reconsideration of the Court's May 7, 2014 Order of Dismissal [Doc. # 8 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for le ave to appeal in forma pauperis [Doc. # 9 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, either pay the $505 appellate filing fee or file a motion in the United States Court of Appeal s for the Eighth Circuit for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file any future documents or pleadings in connection with his appeal directly with the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit. IT IS HEREBY CERTIFIED that an appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith. See 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(a)(3). Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 08/21/2014. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smalley v. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James H. Smalley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George A. Lombardi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Prudden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Sturm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Griggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?