Harrell et al v. Boeing Co., The, et al
Plaintiff: James Harrell and Edna Harrell
Defendant: Boeing Co., The, Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc., CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, General Electric Company, Georgia Pacific, LLC, Goodrich Corporation, Honeywell International, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Trane U.S., Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., Young Group Ltd. and Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.
Cross_claimant: General Electric Company
Cross_defendant: General Electric Company, Boeing Co., The, Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc., CBS Corporation, Crane Co., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Georgia Pacific, LLC, Goodrich Corporation, Edna Harrell, James Harrell, Honeywell International, Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation, Trane U.S., Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, United Technologies Corporation, Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc., Young Group Ltd. and Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2014cv00479
Filed: March 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 118 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any remaining defendant objecting to the Court granting plaintiffs' amended motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice [#117] shall show cause in writing by noon on March 24 , 2015, why the motion for dismissal should not be granted. Failure to file a timely objection will result in the Court granting plaintiffs' motion without further notice by this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any defendant with a pending cr ossclaim who objects to the dismissal of that crossclaim without prejudice upon the granting of plaintiffs' motion for voluntary dismissal without prejudice must show cause in writing by noon on March 24, 2015, why the crossclaims should not be dismissed. Any such objection shall also state the asserted basis of the Court's subject matter jurisdiction over its crossclaim. If a defendant with a pending crossclaim does not file an objection in compliance with this Show Cause Order by noon on March 24, 2015, the Court will construe the lack of an objection as a request for dismissal of its crossclaim without prejudice in the event that plaintiffs' motion for voluntary dismissal is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that fa ilure to file a timely objection in compliance with this Order to Show Cause will result in the Court granting plaintiffs' amended notice of voluntary dismissal [#117], dismissing all pending claims and crossclaims without prejudice (each par ty to bear its own costs), and closing this case without further notice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs' first motion for voluntary dismissal [#116] is denied as moot. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on March 17, 2015. (MCB) Modified on 3/17/2015 (MCB).
August 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Whittaker's motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction [# 66 ] is granted without opposition, and defendant Whittaker is dismissed from this action without prejudice. IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that defendants Foster Wheeler Energy Corp. and Goodrich Corp. are dismissed without prejudice for plaintiffs' failure to timely obtain service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs shall show cause in w riting within 10 days of the date of this Order why this action should not be dismissed without prejudice in its entirety for plaintiffs' failure to comply with my August 12, 2014 Memorandum and Order. If plaintiffs request that the Court not dismiss this action, then their response to this Memorandum and Order to Show Cause shall include a status report as required by my August 12, 2014 Memorandum and Order. Failure to timely comply with this Memorandum and Order to Show Cause will result in the dismissal of this action without prejudice without further notice or Order from this Court. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on August 26, 2014. (Show Cause Response due by 9/5/2014.) (BRP)
August 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Union Carbide's motion [# 77 ] is granted in part only as follows: this Court will institute denials under Rule 5(c)(1)(B) and order that any crossclaim, counterclaim, avoidance, or affirmative defense in those pleadings and replies to them will be treated as denied or avoided by all other parties; and, all defendants are granted leave to file any counterclaim or crossclaim by September 12, 2014. In all other respects, the motion is denied. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on August 22, 2014. (BRP)
August 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs shall file a status report and comply with the other provisions of this Memorandum and Order as set out above by August 25, 2014.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Bushnell shall either seek leave to file aresponsive pleading out of time within five (5) days of the date of this Order, or plaintiffs shall move for entry of default and default judgment as set out above by August 25, 2014. Response to Court due by 8/25/2014. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on August 12, 2014. (MCB)
April 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (read order for details) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for joinder [# 14 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all other pending motions [# 9 , # 10 , # 11 , # 18 ] are denied in part and denied without prejudice in part as set out above. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 04/01/2014. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harrell et al v. Boeing Co., The, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Harrell
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Represented By: Stephanie L. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edna Harrell
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Represented By: Stephanie L. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boeing Co., The
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles L. Joley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation
Represented By: Robert F. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: Raymond R. Fournie
Represented By: Anita M. Kidd
Represented By: Melanie R. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Boeing Co., The
Represented By: William R. Irwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Borgwarner Morse Tec Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: CBS Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Georgia Pacific, LLC
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Edna Harrell
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Represented By: Stephanie L. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: James Harrell
Represented By: Steven M. Aroesty
Represented By: Stephanie L. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: J.P. Bushnell Packing Supply Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles L. Joley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Northrop Grumman Systems Corporation
Represented By: Robert F. Chandler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Trane U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Carl J. Geraci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Bash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Valentino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Whittaker, Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Young Group Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Young Insulation Group of St. Louis, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?