Rolfe et al v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Rhonda Rolfe and Peter Rolfe
Defendant: Mohammed Haque, M.D., Biomet Orthopedics, LLC, Biomet, Inc. and Kindred Hospitals East, LLC
Case Number: 4:2014cv00738
Filed: April 14, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside Home State
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Plaintiffs' motion for reconsideration is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 24 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the entire case is remanded to the Circuit Court for the County of St. Louis, State of Missouri. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/29/2014. (NEB)
July 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to remand is DENIED IN PART and GRANTED IN PART. (Doc. No. 13 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' products liability claims against Defendants Biomet, Inc., and B iomet Orthopedics LCC, are severed from Plaintiffs' medical negligence claims against Defendants Kindred Hospitals East, LLC, and Mohammed Haque, M.D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' products liability claims against Defendants Biomet, Inc., and Biomet Orthopedics, LCC, will remain in this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' medical negligence claims against Defendants Kindred Hospitals East, LLC, and Mohammed Haque, M.D., are remanded to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on July 14, 2014. (BRP)
July 8, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to remand is DENIED IN ART and GRANTED IN PART. (Doc. No. 13.) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs products liability claims against Defendants Biomet, Inc., and Biomet Orthopedics LC C, are severed from Plaintiffs medical negligence claims against Defendants Kindred Hospitals East, LLC, and Mohammed Haque, M.D. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs products liability claims against Defendants Biomet, Inc., and Biomet Orthopedics, LCC, will remain in this Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs medical negligence claims against Defendants Kindred Hospitals East, LLC, and Mohammed Haque, M.D., are remanded to the Circuit Court of St. Louis County, Missouri. re: 13 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Peter Rolfe, Plaintiff Rhonda Rolfe. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/8/14. (JWJ)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rolfe et al v. Biomet, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Haque, M.D.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet Orthopedics, LLC
Represented By: Robert L. Duckels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Biomet, Inc.
Represented By: Robert L. Duckels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kindred Hospitals East, LLC
Represented By: James J. Hennelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Rolfe
Represented By: Timothy J. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Rolfe
Represented By: Timothy J. Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?