Williams et al v. Bank of America
Plaintiff: |
Carol Williams and Earl Williams |
Defendant: |
Bank of America |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv00740 |
Filed: |
April 9, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 2, 2014 |
Filing
17
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 14] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). An Order of Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 6/2/14. (JWJ)
|
April 16, 2014 |
Filing
2
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than May 15, 2014, Plaintiffs shall notify the Court whether they consent to the filing of these pleadings as a new cause of action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to Plaint iffs a copy of the Courts Civil Complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall mail to Plaintiffs a copy of the Courts Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis B Non Prisoner along with a CJA 23 financial affidavit form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiffs choose to proceed with this action, they must file an amended complaint on the Court-provided form no later than May 15, 2014. The amended complaint must comply with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED tha t Plaintiffs shall either pay the $400 filing fee or submit separate motions to proceed in forma pauperis no later than May 15, 2014. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiffs fail to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this action without further notice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/16/2014. (RAK)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?