Schamel v. Lawrence
Petitioner: John Randall Schamel
Respondent: Scott Lawrence
Case Number: 4:2014cv01199
Filed: July 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Cole
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM re: 1 writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 filed by John Randall Schamel. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/20/15. (KKS)
August 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No. 11] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/4/2014. (KMS)
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioner is granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall show cause, in writing and no later than August 7, 2014, why the petition for writ of habeas corpus should not be dismissed as time-barred. Signed by Magistrate Judge Terry I. Adelman on 7/7/14. (KJS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schamel v. Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Randall Schamel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Lawrence
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?