Robbe v. Webster University
Plaintiff: Lily Robbe
Defendant: Webster University
Case Number: 4:2014cv01223
Filed: July 8, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 110 OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration, [Doc. # 103 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 5/11/17. (KXS)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 98 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to enforce settlement is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion to enforce the settlement agreement is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall file, within thirty (30) days of the date of this order unless an extension is granted, a stipulation for dismissal, a motion for leave to voluntarily dismiss, or a proposed consent judgment. Failure to comply timely with this order will result in the dismissal of this action with prejudice. (Dismissal Paper(s) due by 5/10/2017.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/10/17. (KJS)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 9 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Webster University motion is IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. 9 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 03/25/2015. (CLK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Robbe v. Webster University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lily Robbe
Represented By: Andrew W. Kuhlmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Webster University
Represented By: Dennis C. Donnelly
Represented By: Travis R. Kearbey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?