Maxson v. Calder Brothers Corporation
Plaintiff: Daniel Maxson
Defendant: Calder Brothers Corporation
Case Number: 4:2014cv01360
Filed: August 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Warren
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : Upon review of the record and following the final pretrial conference in this case held on the record on December 9, 2015, and for the reasons stated by the Court thereat, the Court sets forth its rulings on the parties motions in limine and objections to deposition designations as follows: (See Memorandum and Order for complete details.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/10/2015. (KCB)
October 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER motion is Granted IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Jury to View Demonstrative Exhibit of the Subject Paver is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 37 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the within ten (10) days of this Order, Defendant shall submit a document identifying the size and dimensions of the paver and any trailer on which it may be mounted, so that the Court may determine a practical location for the jury to view it during trial. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 10/21/2015. (KCB)
September 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to exclude is DENIED, except with respect to supplemental materials not disclosed as part of the June 29, 2015 production and in Gary Hutters supplemental report. (Doc. No. [2 9].) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall notify the Court, within ten days of this Memorandum and Order, whether he wishes to re-depose Gary Hutter. If he does wish to do so, Defendant shall make Hutter available for the new deposition withi n 28 days of this Memorandum and Order, with Defendant bearing the reasonable costs incurred by Plaintiff in connection therewith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if the parties believe this Order requires modification of the current Case Management Orde r (CMO), the parties must confer in good faith, and within ten days of Plaintiffs above notification, submit a joint proposed modification of the CMO. ( Response to Court due by 9/24/2015.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/14/2015. (NEB)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to exclude the expert testimony and opinions of Bob Joynt is DENIED as moot in part, and DENIED on the merits in part, as set forth above. (Doc. No. 27 .) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/7/2015. (NEB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maxson v. Calder Brothers Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Maxson
Represented By: Timothy M. Cronin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calder Brothers Corporation
Represented By: Michael T. Kokal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?