Harvill v. Phelps County Restaurant
Plaintiff: |
Lucas Harvill |
Defendant: |
Phelps County Restaurant LLC and Chris Morgan |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv01444 |
Filed: |
August 19, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Phelps |
Presiding Judge: |
John A. Ross |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 5 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 8, 2015 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion for (1) Certification of a Class For Settlement Purposes; (2) Preliminary Approval of the Class Action Settlement Agreement; and (3) Approval of the Notice to Class Me mbers 48 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that for purposes of settlement, two separate classes are certified:...SEE ORDER...IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' proposed class notice, filed as Exhibit 3 to the Settlement Agreement (Doc . No. 48-1 at 22-26), shall serve as notice in this case. Within ten (10) days of the date of this Order, and no later than Thursday, June 18, 2015, class counsel shall send the notice to the class members by first class mail. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will hold a final fairness hearing on Thursday, July 30, 2015 at 2:00 p.m.,...SEE ORDER...IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the Court's June 3, 2015 Order 49 is VACATED.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/8/15. (LGK)
|
February 19, 2015 |
Filing
22
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Conditionally Certify Class, Order Disclosure of Putative Class Members Names and Contact Information and Facilitate Class Notice 21 is GRANTED. The Court conditionally certifies a class of all persons employed by Defendants within the last three (3) years whose compensation included receiving tips and/or who participated in a tip pool or tip sharing arrangement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Lucas Harvill is authorized to act as the conditional class representative. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Riggan Law Firm, LLC is authorized to act as class counsel. See Order for full details. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/19/15. (ARL)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?