Stolzenburg v. Biewer Lumber, LLC et al
Plaintiff: |
Mark A. Stolzenburg |
Defendant: |
Biewer Lumber, LLC and Green Tree Composites, L.L.C. |
Case Number: |
4:2014cv01533 |
Filed: |
September 8, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Noelle C. Collins |
Nature of Suit: |
Contract Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 28, 2016 |
Filing
75
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Green Composites, L.L.C.'s Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(6) (ECF No. 52 ) and Defendant Biewer Lumber, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(B)(2) and 12(B )(6) (ECF No. 54 ) are GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. The Court DISMISSES Plaintiffs claims for implied warranty of merchantability. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court VACATES its May 23, 2016 Order denying Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File an Amended Pleading and Joint Additional Parties (ECF No. 57 ). The Court GRANTS Plaintiff leave to file an Amended Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to file Plaintiffs Amended Complaint. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a Joint Scheduling Plan to the Court within fourteen (14) days of the date of this Order. ( Joint Scheduling Plan due by 7/12/2016.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 06/28/2016. (KCB)
|
May 23, 2016 |
Filing
68
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File an Amended Pleading and Join Additional Parties, or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond to Motions to Dismiss Filed February 9, 2016 (ECF No. 57 ) is GRANTED, in part, and DENIED, in part. Plaintiff shall file his responses to Defendants' Motions to Dismiss no later than May 31, 2016. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 5/23/2016. (NEB)
|
January 14, 2016 |
Filing
50
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents from Defendant Biewer Lumber, LLC, and Suggestions in Support Thereof (ECF No. 43 ) and Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Docu ments from Defendant Green Tree Composites, L.L.C. and Suggestions in Support Thereof (ECF No. 44 ) are GRANTED, in part. Defendants shall supplement their document production in response to requests for production numbers 16-17 within ten (10) da ys of the date ofthis Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Biewer Lumber LLC and Green Tree Composites, LLC's Unopposed Motion for Clarification (ECF No. 49 ) is GRANTED, in part. Defendants shall file any responsive pleadings within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on January 14, 2016. (BRP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?