Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust et al v. Innovative Concrete, LLC
Plaintiff: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Fund, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan, Mark Darr and Mike Whalen
Defendant: Innovative Concrete, LLC
Case Number: 4:2014cv02066
Filed: December 17, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to compel is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 27 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a representative of Defendant shall appear for a deposition on Friday, October 16, 2015 at 10:00 a.m. in the l aw offices of Hartnett Gladney Hetterman, L.L.C., 4399 Laclede Avenue, St. Louis, MO 63108, and shall produce the documents requested by Plaintiffs in the notice sent on July 24, 2015 (Doc. No. 27-3). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to comply wi th this Memorandum and Order may result in sanctions, including finding an individual principle of Defendant in civil contempt. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Memorandum and Order to Defendant at 620 Ivy Chase Lane, Fenton, MO 63026. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on September 30, 2015. (BRP)
July 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for default judgment is GRANTED. [Doc. # 18 ] An appropriate Judgment showing Defendants full liability of $5,847.30 for the periods set forth above shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 7/23/2015. (NEB)
March 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendant Innovative Concrete, LLC, shall have up to and including April 7, 2015, to show the Court why it should not be held in civil contempt and sanctions imposed against it for failure to comply with the Court's Order of February 11, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that should Plaintiffs wish the Court to find a particular individual in civil contempt and impose sanctions against him or her, along with the named corporate Defendan t, Plaintiffs shall provide the Court, on or before April 7, 2015, with the proof set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendant Innovative Concrete, LLC, at the address reflected in the record. (Response to Court due by 4/7/2015. Show Cause Response due by 4/7/2015.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 30, 2015. (BRP)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for an Order compelling an accounting is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 4 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall submit its payroll registers and other docume nts needed to perform an audit to an auditor of Plaintiffs' choice, within 21 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Failure to comply with this Order may result in a finding of civil contempt against Defendant and the imposi tion of sanctions including a fine and/or incarceration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall effect service of this Memorandum and Order on Defendant by whatever means they believe to be most effective, and shall promptly file a certifi cate of such service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall have 14 days after completion of the audit to file a properly supported motion for default judgment. If said motion is not filed prior to March 27, 2015, Plaintiff shall file a status report with the Court on or before that date. ( Response to Court due by 3/27/2015.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/11/2015. (NEB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust et al v. Innovative Concrete, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Darr
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Whalen
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovative Concrete, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?