Beedle v. Steele
Petitioner: Jeremy Beedle
Respondent: Troy Steele
Case Number: 4:2014cv02126
Filed: December 31, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Noelle C. Collins
Presiding Judge: E. Richard Webber
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Report and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins 39 is SUSTAINED, ADOPTED, AND INCORPORATED herein. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Jeremy Beed le's Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 1 is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Jeremy Beedle's Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus 4 is DENIED, and this action is DISMISSED. The Court shall not issue a certificate of appealability as to any claim raised by Petitioner. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 2/26/18. (EAB)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Jeremy Beedle's "Notice of Appeal" [ECF No. 26 ], is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 8/3/2015. (CBL)
May 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Jeremy Beedles Motion to Stay Proceedings [ECF No. 3 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner file, by June 22, 2015, either a notice to the Court indicating his intention to proceed with his habeas petition, or a Motion to voluntarily dismiss the petition. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 5/21/15. (EAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beedle v. Steele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jeremy Beedle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Troy Steele
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?