Willis v. St. Louis Real Estate et al
Plaintiff: |
Cleo Willis, Sr. |
Defendant: |
John Morgan and Ryan Wessel |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00037 |
Filed: |
January 7, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Thomas C. Mummert |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
June 24, 2016 |
Filing
58
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Ryan Wessels's motion for summary judgment (ECF #41) is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER HEREBY ORDERED that defendant John Morgan's motion for summary judgment (ECF #43) is GRANTED. IT IS FINALLY HEREBY ORDERED that judgment is entered in favor of defendants John Morgan and Ryan Wessels and against plaintiff Cleo Willis, Sr.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 6/24/16. (MRS)
|
May 21, 2015 |
Filing
33
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion for summary judgment filed by Ryan Wessel [Doc. 17 ] and the motion for summary judgment filed by John Morgan [Doc. 19 ] are each DENIED without prejudice as set forth a bove. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion by Ryan Wessel to compel discovery from Plaintiff [Doc. 29 ] is set for a hearing in Courtroom 13N on Monday, June 29, 2015, at 9:30 a.m. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that a Rule 16 scheduling conference shall b e held in Courtroom 13N on Monday, June 29, 2015, immediately following the motion hearing. Plaintiff and counsel for Defendants must all appear and must be prepared to discuss and deadlines for (a) the close of discovery and (b) the filing of dispositive motions. A trial date will be set at this conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas C. Mummert, III on 05/21/2015. (CBL)
|
January 20, 2015 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have until February 19, 2015 to provide the Court with the addresses for John Morgan and Ryan Wessel.( Response to Court due by 2/19/2015.) Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/20/2015. (KMS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?