Eden v. Vaughan, et. al.
Plaintiff: Jeremey Eden
Defendant: St. Louis, City of, St. Louis Metropolitan Police Department, Ronald Vaughan, Kyle Chandlers and John Does 1-2
Case Number: 4:2015cv00212
Filed: January 30, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: E. Richard Webber
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 114 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendants' Motion for Bill of Costs is hereby GRANTED. [ECF No. 112 ] Plaintiff shall pay Defendants' costs in the amount of $1,117.90. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 10/18/16. (EAB)
September 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. This matter comes before the Court on Plaintiff Jeremey Edens Second Supplemental Motion in Limine,[ECF No. 97] and Mr. John Garvey's Motion to Quash Subpoena [ECF No. 99]. Plaintiff's motion requests the court to ent er an order prohibiting Defendants from making any references or arguments Defendant Officers received awards and commendation from their field of law enforcement. Defendants confess they will not present such evidence. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaint iff's Second Supplemental Motion in Limine is hereby GRANTED. [ECF No. 97 ]. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Witness John Garvey's Motion to Quash Subpoena is hereby SUSTAINED. [ECF No. 99 ]. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 9/1/16. (EAB)
August 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 85 MOTION in Limine filed by Plaintiff Jeremey Eden, 84 MOTION in Limine filed by Defendant Ronald Vaughan, Defendant Kyle Chandler. (See Memorandum and Order for complete details.) Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on August 25, 2016. (MCB)
August 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 68 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby GRANTED in PART and DENIED in part. [ECF No. 50 ]; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment with respect to Plaintiff's conspiracy claim is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the remainder of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment is DENIED. [ECF No. 50 ]. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 8/15/2016. (CBL)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant City of St. Louis's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 8] is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Ronald Vaughan, Kyle Chandler, and St. Louis Metropolitan Police Department&# 039;s Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 11] is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file an Amended Complaint, in accordance with the Courts legal determinations, within twenty (20) days. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on April 6, 2015. (MCB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eden v. Vaughan, et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis, City of
Represented By: Alexis Lee Silsbe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Louis Metropolitan Police Department
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Vaughan
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Chandlers
Represented By: Karin A. Schute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeremey Eden
Represented By: Samuel Henderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?