Wilson et al v. PNK (River City), LLC.
Plaintiff: |
Lawrence M. Wilson, Darren Metzger and Charles Patterson |
Defendant: |
PNK (River City), LLC |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00380 |
Filed: |
February 27, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Nature of Suit: |
Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause of Action: |
15 U.S.C. ยง 5 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 22, 2017 |
Filing
79
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice as to Plaintiffs Darren Metzger, Charles Patterson, Lawrence Wilson, Tedd Gan, and Sandra Gaither, pursuant to their previously filed Stipulations to Dismiss. (Doc. No. 66 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the case is DISMISSED without prejudice to the opt- in Plaintiffs Linhart, Remington, and Wyrsch to file their own individual lawsuits. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the statute of limitations will be STAYED for thirty (30) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order to permit opt-in Plaintiffs Linhart, Remington, and Wyrsch to file individual actions. Opt-in Plaintiffs Linhart, Remington, and Wyrsch are advised that the statute of limitations will begin to run again after this additional thirty-day period. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall serve a copy of this Memorandum and Order to opt-in Plaintiffs Linhart, Remington, and Wyrsch at their addresses, as provided in Doc. No. 70 . (cc: Opt-In Plaintiffs) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 02/22/2017. (KCB)
|
June 29, 2016 |
Filing
56
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment on the Claims of Kenneth Ridgley (Doc. No. 48 ) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on June 29, 2016. (BRP)
|
August 31, 2015 |
Filing
33
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for conditional certification to proceed as collective action and facilitate notice under 29 U.S.C. §216(b) is GRANTED, with the exception that Defendant need not provide Plaintiffs with telephone numbers of potential opt-in plaintiffs at this point. (Doc. No. 17 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion to amend their request for relief, to require posting of the Notice, is DENIED. (Do c. No. 27 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall confer in good faith with respect to the form of Notice and Opt-In Consent Form and shall have until Friday, September 4, 2015 to file a proposed amended Notice of Collective Action Lawsuit and Opt-In Consent Form consistent with this Order. Defendant shall have until Wednesday, September 9, 2015 to file any objections to the amended proposed forms. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/31/2015. (CBL)
|
June 25, 2015 |
Filing
28
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion for partial dismissal is DENIED, with the exception of claims for unjust enrichment accruing more than two years before the filing of the complaint. (Doc. No. 12 .) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on June 25, 2015. (BRP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?