St. Louis Heart Center, Inc. v. Nomax, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
St. Louis Heart Center, Inc. |
Defendant: |
Nomax, Inc. and John Does 1-10 |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv00517 |
Filed: |
March 24, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - County |
Presiding Judge: |
Ronnie L. White |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Statutory Actions |
Cause of Action: |
47 U.S.C. ยง 0227 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Defendant |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 20, 2017 |
Filing
98
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Nomax, Inc. 's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Standing (ECF No. 90 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 03/20/2017. (KCB)
|
December 23, 2015 |
Filing
61
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Nomax, Inc.'s Motion to Strike and/or Dismiss (ECF No. 36 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Nomax, Inc's Motion and Memorandum in Support of Mot ion to Quash Subpoena to Windstream Communications, LLC (ECF No. 48 ) and Defendant Nomax, Inc's Motion and Memorandum in Support of Motion to Quash Subpoena to Interfax US Inc. (ECF No. 56 ) are GRANTED. Windstream Communications, LLC and Interfax US Inc. shall produce records only related to Exhibits A-F to the Second Amended Complaint. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification (ECF No. 7 ) is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiff can refile its Motion for Class Certification after the appropriate discovery has been conducted. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/23/2015. (NEB)
|
May 1, 2015 |
Filing
27
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that attorney Brian J. Wanca's Motion for Additional Time to Submit Application to Practice Before this Court (ECF No. 26) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Mr. Wanca's Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hae Vice (ECF No. 20) is DENIED.. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 5/1/15. (JWJ)
|
April 23, 2015 |
Filing
21
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that attorney Brian J. Wanca shall, by April 30, 2015, either (1) file a verified statement that he will submit an application for admission to practice before this Court pursuant to Local Rule 12.0l(C) by May 15, 2015, or (2) seek leave to withdraw his entry of appearance in this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the motion for pro hac vice admission filed by Mr. Wanca remains pending. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Mr. Wanca elects to seek leave to withdraw his entry of appearance in this case, he shall attach a copy of this order to any future motions for admission pro hac vice that he files in this district. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on April 23, 2015. (BRP)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?