REZNIK et al v. HMSHost Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Randall Johnson, Dian Lathan, Timothy Johnson and Jon Reznik
Defendant: Host International, Inc., HMS Host USA, LLC and HMSHost Corporation
Case Number: 4:2015cv00648
Filed: April 17, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Charles A Shaw
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1938
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2016. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER - IT IS SO ORDERED re: #13 STIPULATION of Dismissal, Terminate Case. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/27/2016. (MRC)
January 26, 2016 Filing 33 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiffs Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan, Jon Reznik. (Keane, Ryan)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT PROPOSED SCHEDULING PLAN -.... {see Order for complete details}.... Upon review of the joint proposed scheduling plan described in paragraph 3 below, the Court will consider whether a Scheduling Conference is necessary or advisable prior to the issuance of a Case Management Order. This case is assigned to Track: Preliminary Track Two(2)..No later than February 15, 2016, counsel shall file a joint proposed scheduling plan with the Court. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/15/2016.. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/21/2016. (MRC)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER -....IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Misjoinder is DENIED. [Doc. 8]. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on 1/20/2016. (MRC)
October 28, 2015 Filing 30 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, by HMS Host USA, LLC, Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Deposition of Coleman Lauterbach)(Vlasek, Jeffrey)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Docket Text ORDER RE: Doc. #9 , MOTION to Dismiss Party Jon Reznik, filed by defendants HMS Host USA, LLC, and Host International, Inc.; ORDERED DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on October 19, 2015. (LTR)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Docket Text ORDER RE: Doc. #20 , MOTION to Dismiss Party Jon Reznik, filed by defendants HMS Host USA, LLC and Host International, Inc.; ORDERED DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on October 19, 2015.(LTR)
October 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Docket Text ORDER RE: Doc. #26 , Joint Motion to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss Jon Reznik, Doc. #20 ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on October 19, 2015. (LTR)
October 14, 2015 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Withdraw #20 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jon Reznik by Defendants HMS Host USA, LLC, HMSHost Corporation, Host International, Inc.. (Vlasek, Jeffrey)
August 28, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan, Jon Reznik re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jon Reznik, #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Notice of Additional Supplemental Persuasive Authority (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opinion Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Keane, Ryan)
July 31, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan, Jon Reznik re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jon Reznik, #22 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Opinion Denying Defendants' Motion to Dismiss)(Keane, Ryan)
July 24, 2015 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jon Reznik filed by Defendants HMS Host USA, LLC, Host International, Inc.. (Vlasek, Jeffrey)
July 17, 2015 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jon Reznik filed by Plaintiffs Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan, Jon Reznik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Excerpts from Lauterbach Deposition)(Keane, Ryan)
July 13, 2015 Filing 21 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint, by HMS Host USA, LLC, Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Lauterbach Deposition)(Vlasek, Jeffrey)
July 13, 2015 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss Party Jon Reznik by Defendants HMS Host USA, LLC, Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion To Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Terminationn Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B - Opt-In Form, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Decertification Order, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D - Lauterbach Deposition Transcript, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E - Dorvil Decision)(Vlasek, Jeffrey)
July 2, 2015 Filing 19 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Sever Jon Reznik, Dian Lathan, Timothy Johnson and Randall Johnson MOTION to Dismiss Party Dian Lathan, Timothy Johnson and Randall Johnson Plaintiffs filed by Defendants HMSHost Corporation, Host International, Inc.. (Lewis, John)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER Re: Doc. #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Gregory Mersol on behalf of Host International, Inc., HMS Host USA, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on July 2, 2015. (MBP)
July 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER Re: Doc. #15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by attorney Jeffrey Vlasek on behalf of Host International, Inc., HMS Host USA, LLC; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on July 2, 2015. (MBP)
July 1, 2015 Summons Issued as to defendant HMS Host USA, LLC. The summons was emailed to Attorney Ryan Keane. (MRC)
June 30, 2015 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Gregory Mersol. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 4644050849) by Defendants HMS Host USA, LLC, Host International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(JWD)
June 30, 2015 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Vlasek. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 4644050850) by Defendants HMS Host USA, LLC, Host International, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(JWD)
June 30, 2015 Receipt 4644050850 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Jeffrey Richard Vlasek (CCAM)
June 30, 2015 Receipt 4644050849 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Gregory V. Mersol (CCAM)
June 29, 2015 Filing 14 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan, Jon Reznik (Keane, Ryan)
June 29, 2015 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Host International, Inc., HMS Host USA, LLC,Terminating HMSHost Corporation , filed by Jon Reznik, Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan. (Attachments: #1 Summons as to HMS Host USA, LLC)(Keane, Ryan)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER RE: Doc. #7 Motion for Leave for Fran L Rudich to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by plaintiffs Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan, and Jon Reznik; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on June 29, 2015. (LTR)
June 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER RE: Doc. #6 , Motion for Leave for Michael H Reed to Appear Pro Hac Vice, filed by plaintiffs Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan, and Jon Reznik; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Charles A. Shaw on June 29, 2015. (LTR)
June 26, 2015 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Sever Jon Reznik, Dian Lathan, Timothy Johnson and Randall Johnson MOTION to Dismiss Party Dian Lathan, Timothy Johnson and Randall Johnson Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan, Jon Reznik. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Reed, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Michael Reed)(Keane, Ryan)
June 19, 2015 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Party Plaintiff Jon Reznik by Defendants HMSHost Corporation, Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendants' MOtion to Dismiss Plaintiff Reznik, #2 Exhibit A - Termination Notice, #3 Exhibit B - Opt In Form, #4 Exhibit C - Stevens Decertification Order, #5 Exhibit D - Lauterbach 12-12-13 Deposition Transcript)(Lewis, John)
June 19, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION to Sever Jon Reznik, Dian Lathan, Timothy Johnson and Randall Johnson, MOTION to Dismiss Party Dian Lathan, Timothy Johnson and Randall Johnson Plaintiffs by Defendants HMSHost Corporation, Host International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum of Law in Support of Its Motion to Sever and Dismiss for Misjoinder, #2 Exhibit A - Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Conditional Certification Order, #4 Exhibit C - Decertification Order)(Lewis, John)
June 17, 2015 Receipt 4644050627 in the amount of $100.00 for PRO HAC VICE on behalf of Fran L. Rudich (CCAM)
June 16, 2015 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fran L Rudich. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 50627) by Plaintiffs Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan, Jon Reznik. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Envelope)(JAB)
June 15, 2015 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael H Reed. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100) by Plaintiffs Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan, Jon Reznik. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Envelope)(JAB)
June 2, 2015 Filing 5 CJRA ORDER (GJL). Judge Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen termed. Case reassigned to Judge District Judge Charles A. Shaw for all further proceedings (KMS)
May 11, 2015 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendants HMSHost Corporation, Host International, Inc.. Parent companies: Autogrill Group, Inc., Autogrill Group International, Inc., Autogrill Overseas, Inc., Autogrill SpA, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: Autogrill Group, Inc., Autogrill Group International, Inc., Autogrill Overseas, Inc., Autogrill SpA,. (Lewis, John)
May 11, 2015 Filing 3 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by HMSHost Corporation, Host International, Inc..(Lewis, John)
April 20, 2015 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiffs Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan, Jon Reznik Process Server: Harmon Legal Process Service, LLC (BAK)
April 20, 2015 Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form # (moed-0041.pdf) consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction and all non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: U.S. Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen. Summons to issue when Notice of Process Server is filed. (BAK)
April 20, 2015 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401. (CSAW)
April 20, 2015 Summons Issued as to defendant HMSHost Corporation, Host International, Inc.. The summons were emailed to attorney Ryan A. Keane. (BAK)
April 17, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number 0865-4826319, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by JON REZNIK, Randall Johnson, Timothy Johnson, Dian Lathan. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Keane, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: REZNIK et al v. HMSHost Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Host International, Inc.
Represented By: John B. Lewis
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMS Host USA, LLC
Represented By: Gregory V. Mersol
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMSHost Corporation
Represented By: John B. Lewis
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Vlasek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randall Johnson
Represented By: Michael H Reed
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Represented By: Ryan A. Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dian Lathan
Represented By: Michael H Reed
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Represented By: Ryan A. Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Johnson
Represented By: Michael H Reed
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Represented By: Ryan A. Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Reznik
Represented By: Michael H Reed
Represented By: Fran L. Rudich
Represented By: Ryan A. Keane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?