Victorian v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Plaintiff: Lenore Victorian
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Case Number: 4:2015cv00667
Filed: April 22, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Charles
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 117 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to stay the unlawful detainer action pending in the Circuit Court of St. Charles County is DENIED. ECF No. 112 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/10/2017. (NEB)
June 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion for summary judgment is GRANTED. ECF No. 85 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 06/12/2017. (KCB)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Chase Bank, N.A.'s motion for judgment on the pleadings is GRANTED, and the Court hereby declares that this Defendant has no right, title, or interest in and to the property that is the subject of this lawsuit. (Doc. No. 64 .) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 2, 2016. (BRP)
December 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 55 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motions to dismiss are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set forth above. (Doc. Nos. 30 & 41 .) Counts I and IV are DISMISSED with prejudice. Count V is DISMISSED without prejudice. Count VI is DISMISSED without prejudice as to Chase only. In all other respects, the motions are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/14/2015. (NEB)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to strike is GRANTED in part, to the extent that it requests that the Court exclude all references to facts and exhibits not contained in Plaintiff's amended complaint; th e motion is otherwise DENIED. (Doc. No. 35 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until October 6, 2015 to file a response to the motion to dismiss filed by Defendants Wells Fargo Home Mortgage and Deutsche Bank National Trust Company. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on September 30, 2015. (BRP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Victorian v. Wells Fargo Home Mortgage et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lenore Victorian
Represented By: Erika J. Wentzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Home Mortgage
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Represented By: Jonathan B. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deutsche Bank National Trust Company
Represented By: Eric D. Martin
Represented By: Jonathan B. Potts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?