Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust et al v. United Ironworkers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust, Dennis Hellenberg, John Davis, Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Fund and Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan
Defendant: United Ironworkers, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2015cv00713
Filed: May 5, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act of 1974
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1131
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion (Doc. No. 60 ) for attorney's fees, costs, and audit costs is GRANTED in the following amounts: $28,343.34 in attorneys fees, $16,563.10 in audit costs, and � 36;1,931.22 in court costs. These amounts shall be added to the Courts prior award of summary judgment in favor of Plaintiffs in the amount of $95,854.99. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants motion for attorneys fees is DENIED. (Doc. No. 61 .) All claims against all parties having been resolved, a separate Judgment, showing Defendants full liability of $142,692.65, shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/9/2016. (NEB)
September 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that summary judgment is entered on behalf of Plaintiffs and against Defendant in the amount of $95,854.99. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs request for audit costs shall be made by separate mot ion, with any supporting documentary evidence, within 21 days after the date of this Order. Defendant may file an opposition brief within 14 days after being served with the motion, and any reply shall be due within 7 days thereafter. IT IS FURTHE R ORDERED that any motion for attorneys fees shall be filed in accordance with the deadlines set forth in Local Rule 8.02. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial setting of October 11, 2016 is VACATED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/26/2016. (NEB)
September 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Union Ironworkers, Inc.'s motion for partial summary judgment is GRANTED in part, as to alleged delinquent contributions, liquidated damages, and interest for bonuses, hours worked by E ugene Edwards and Gerry Edwards, and hours worked by ironworkers in Indiana. Defendant's motion is otherwise DENIED. (Doc. No. 42 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for summary judgment is DENIED in part, to the extent Defendant& #039;s motion is granted, and is otherwise GRANTED. (Doc. No. 45 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer, and within 14 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, submit their agreed or respective positions as to the amount of th e alleged delinquent contributions, liquidated damages, and interest for bonuses, hours worked by Eugene Edwards and Gerry Edwards, and hours worked by ironworkers in Indiana, to be deducted from Plaintiffs' requested damages. The Court will enter final judgment after resolving this issue. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for an Order compelling a further audit is GRANTED. Defendant shall submit its payroll registers and other documents needed to perform an audit for the period of July 1, 2014 to the present, within 30 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, pursuant to the procedures set forth in the parties' agreements. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/8/16. (KXS)
August 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss or, in the alternative, for a more definite statement is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (Doc. No. 13 .) The motion is GRANTED to the extent it seeks a more de finite statement of the contracts at issue and the time periods they cover, and the motion is DENIED in all other respects. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before August 27, 2015, Plaintiffs shall file an amended complaint that specifically identif ies the contracts at issue and the time periods they cover. Failure to do so may result in the dismissal of Plaintiffs' complaint. ( Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 8/27/2015.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 8/13/2015. (NEB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust et al v. United Ironworkers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Annuity Trust
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krol
Represented By: Joseph E. Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Hellenberg
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krol
Represented By: Joseph E. Mallon
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krol
Represented By: Joseph E. Mallon
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krol
Represented By: Joseph E. Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Davis
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krol
Represented By: Joseph E. Mallon
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krol
Represented By: Joseph E. Mallon
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krol
Represented By: Joseph E. Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Pension Fund
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krol
Represented By: Joseph E. Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Iron Workers St. Louis District Council Welfare Plan
Represented By: Michael A. Evans
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Krol
Represented By: Joseph E. Mallon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Ironworkers, Inc.
Represented By: Michael L. McGlynn
Represented By: William J. Niehoff
Represented By: Laura E. Schrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?