White v United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Hope Angelic White
Defendant: United States of America and Bernard Henson
Case Number: 4:2015cv01252
Filed: August 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 147 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the plaintiff's motion for new trial or to alter or amend judgment (#136) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/8/2019. (JMC)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that judgment will be entered against plaintiff and in favor of defendant on plaintiffs FTCA claim. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/29/19. (CSG)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motions for summary judgment (#50, #52) are DENIED in part and GRANTED in part.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for sanctions (#78) is DENIED.IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that defendants motion to exclude plaintiffs expert testimony (#54) is GRANTED in part as described above. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 5/16/18. (MRS)
January 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER..IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for sanctions (#56) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall inspect the recovered video files and produce any video files related to this matter b y February 9, 2018. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall supply a report to the Court regarding the inspection/production of video files by February 9, 2018.IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint proposed amended Case Management Order as set forth in this Memorandum no later than February 15, 2018. ( Response to Court due by 2/15/2018.). Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/9/18. (MRS)
September 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 41 MOTION to Strike the Undisclosed Opinions of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness filed by Defendant Bernard Hansen, Defendant United States of America motion is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 9/15/17. (MRS)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 3 MOTION to Dismiss :Count I, the claims of Hope Angelic White as the personal representative of the Estate of Myron Pollard in Counts II and IV, the claim against Defendant Hansen in his official capacity in Count III, and Count IV filed by Defendant Bernard Henson, Defendant United States of America; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion to dismiss (#3) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/3/16. (CSG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Angelic White
Represented By: Howard A. Shalowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?