Smith v. Inman et al
Plaintiff: Joseph X. Smith
Defendant: Veera N. Reddy
Case Number: 4:2015cv01297
Filed: August 21, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L. White
Nature of Suit: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order, plaintiff must either pay the $505 appellate filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis in the Court of A ppeals for the Eighth Circuit. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the Court of Appeals. (A copy of this document hand delivered to the Court of Appeals.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 06/21/2016. (KCB)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for leave to file an appeal out of time and for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal [ECF No. 24 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff may file a notice of appeal no later than fourteen (14) days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to reopen case [ECF No. 25 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 04/29/2016. (KCB)
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. An Order of Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/13/2015. (NEB)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for relief from judgment, or in the alternative, to amend his complaint [ECF No. 9 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a § 1983 complaint form. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/21/2015. (NEB)
August 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendant Dr. Veera Reddy in his individual capaci ty. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs official-capacity claims are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Julie Inman is DISMISSED without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on August 24, 2015. (BRP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Inman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph X. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veera N. Reddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?