Stars Investment Group, LLC et al v. AT&T Corp. et al
Plaintiff: |
Stars Investment Group, LLC, Star's Design Group, Inc., Bret Schnitker and Kelly Greene |
Defendant: |
AT&T Corp., Mastec North America, Inc. and Four Winds Construction, LLC |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv01370 |
Filed: |
September 3, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Nature of Suit: |
Torts to Land |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 27, 2017 |
Filing
93
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motions for summary judgment filed by Defendants AT&T Corp. (AT&T) and MasTec North America, Inc. (MasTec) are GRANTED in part, as to Plaintiffs' direct negligence claims against MasTec (Cou nts II and X), Plaintiffs' negligent hiring and negligent supervision claims against AT&T and MasTec (Counts VI, VII, XIV, and XV), and Plaintiff Star's Design Group, Inc.s negligent misrepresentation claim against AT&T (Count XVII). The motions are otherwise DENIED. (Doc. Nos. 69 & 70 .). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/27/2017. (NEB)
|
December 23, 2016 |
Filing
88
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, on or before Friday, January 6, 2017, the parties counsel are directed to meet in person, at which time Defendants counsel shall describe the manner in which the spreadsheets from Defendants AT&T and MasTec were compiled, advise Plaintiffs counsel of the approximate value or cost of the incidents, and in good faith attempt to agree with Plaintiffs counsel on which incidents appear to have resulted in fatalities, injuries, or substantial l oss of property leading to building destruction or debilitation. Defendants counsel are advised that Defendants will be required to produce only the files for incidents which fit within the parameters set forth above. The Court further advises the parties counsel of their obligation to work with one another in good faith to avoid unnecessarily involving this Court in discovery disputes. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 12/23/2016. (NEB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?