Gilliam v. USA
Petitioner: |
Terry Elane Gilliam |
Respondent: |
USA |
Case Number: |
4:2015cv01440 |
Filed: |
September 17, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Nature of Suit: |
Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
March 19, 2018 |
Filing
8
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Terry Gilliams motion filed under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to vacate, set aside, or correct his sentence is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court will not issue a Certificate of Appealability as Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a federal constitutional right as required by 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 03/19/2018. (KCB)
|
September 24, 2015 |
Filing
3
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of movant's instant § 2255 motion and amended motion to the Office of the Public Defender for the Eastern District of Missouri. IT IS FURTH ER ORDERED that the Public Defender shall notify this Court, within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, whether it will be pursuing movants arguments under Johnson, either by filing a written notice in this action of thei r intent not to represent movant, or by filing a second amended motion to vacate, brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255, also in this action, or a request in the Court of Appeals for leave to bring a successive § 2255 motion, as required by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b)(3). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall hold this matter in abeyance for forty-five(45) days. (Response to Court due by 11/8/2015.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 9/24/2015. (NEB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?