Taylor v. Steele et al
Plaintiff: Samuel Lewis Taylor
Defendant: Michael Miller, Jason Crawford, Clive Hedrick, Eric Dunn, John Schneedle and Unknown Culton
Case Number: 4:2015cv01618
Filed: October 26, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Washington
Presiding Judge: Jean C. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 106 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $1.98 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall request that the agency having custody of plaintiff begin making payments in accordance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(b)(2) until the $505 appellate fee is paid in full. Response to Court due by 4/11/2018.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 03/12/2018. (AAS)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No.63) is GRANTED, and Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice. An appropriateJudgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order. 63 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 8/18/17. (CLA)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant Eric Dunn is DISMISSED without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 3/3/16. (KJS)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff must provide the Court with an address where Dunn can be served with process no later than February 29, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss Dunn without prejudice. Response to Court due by 2/29/2016. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 2/11/16. (CLA)
January 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants are directed to submit the last known home addresses for Clive Hedrick and Eric Dunn to the Court, under seal and ex parte, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. (Response to Court due by 2/3/2016.) Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 1/13/16. (KJS)
November 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for reconsideration [ECF No. 5] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Courts Order dated November 2, 2015, is VACATED, in part, in accordance with the terms of this Order. Plaintif f must comply with the filing fee requirements stated in the Order. 5 IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendants Michael Miller, Jason Crawford, Clive Hedrick, Eric Dunn, John Schneedle, and Unknown Culton (Cor rectional Officer I) in accordance with the Courts waiver agreement with the Missouri Department of Corrections. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs official-capacity claims are DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs claims against defendants Troy Steele and Carl Gravett are DISMISSED without prejudice.An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/10/15. (CLA)
November 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $4.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Or der. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceedi ng. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a prisoner civil rights complaint form.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint within twenty-eight days of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. 2 Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 11/2/15. CC: Prisoner civil rights complaint mailed to petitioner.(CLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Steele et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel Lewis Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clive Hedrick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Schneedle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Culton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?