Williams v. USA
Petitioner: Jerome Williams
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2015cv01813
Filed: December 7, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L. White
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 Motion to Vacate / Correct Illegal Sentenc
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within a reasonable time, and in its usual course of business, the United States Probation Office shall prepare and file in movant's criminal case a new Resentence Report relative to movant&# 039;s contentions under Johnson, which shall be filed under seal, with access to the Court and the parties who have entered their appearance in this matter. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS.). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 11/14/2016. (NEB)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that counsel for movant has until November 5, 2016, to file movant' s amended motion to vacate in this matter. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/06/2016. (KCB)
December 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the instant motion to vacate is DENIED, without prejudice, because movant did not obtain permission from the court of appeals to bring the motion in this Court. See 28 U.S.C. § 2255(h). IT IS FU RTHER ORDERED that petitioner's motion for permission to file a successive habeas is DENIED without prejudice as the Court lacks the ability to grant petitioner's motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall TRANSFER the instant mot ion to the United States Court of Appeals for the Eighth Circuit pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1631. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to forward a copy of this Order to the Federal Public Defender for the Eastern District of Missouri. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on December 10, 2015. (BRP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?