IN RE: ASHLEY MADISON CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Plaintiff: John Does 1-21, David Miller, Nhung Truong, CHRIS HRIVNAK, John Doe, John Doe No. 2, J. Doe 4, Keith Macomber, David Poyet, Michael Pauly, Lee E. Campbell, John Hiles, III, J. Doe 2, Grant Deloach, Todd Witengier, J. Doe 5, Marc Benefield, J. Doe 3, John Doe #3, David Yagel, Steven Coward, Britt Garrett, Thadeaus G Scharf, III, John Doe No. 1, Marvin Cabiness, Christopher Russell, SZILVIA BERKI, John Doe #2, Anthony Imbarrato, Robin Fipps, Paul Jack, J. Doe 1, Byron Goetting, Brian Farr, Matthew Lisuzzo, Ms. Jane Doe, Gustavo Alfaro, James Mike Shows, John Doe #1, John Doe # and John Doe 312017
Defendant: Avid Dating Life, Inc., Noel Biderman, Barnes & Thornburg LLP, Avid Life Media, Inc. and Leslie Weiss
Petitioner: Amicus Doe 1, Amicus Doe 3, Amicus Doe 2 and Shawn M O'Malley
Case Number: 4:2015md02669
Filed: December 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 392 FINAL ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that this MDL action is finally closed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to notify the Panel that this action is closed and that no further proceedings are required. (cc: D. Braun, D. O'Leary). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/26/19. (KKS)
June 5, 2019 Filing 391 REMAND ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Sarah S. Vance Chair of the Panel...IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action 4:15-cv-01920-JAR is remanded to the Southern District of Mississippi. (See Order for details) (DLB)
July 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER: Pursuant to the Settlement Agreement and this Courts orders, Plaintiffs and Class Counsels second and final accounting of all funds from the Settlement Fund was filed on July 16, 2018. (Doc. No. #389 ) This case can now be closed. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall close this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of this Order shall be filed in all member cases: 4:15-cv-1132; 4:15-cv-01876; 4:15-cv-01877; 4:15-cv-01878; 4:15- cv-01879; 4:15-cv-01923; 4:15-cv-01924; 4:15-cv-01925; 4:15-cv-01926; 4:15-cv- 01927; 4:15-cv-01928; 4:15-cv-01930; 4:15-cv-01920; 4:15-cv-01943; 4:15-cv- 01945; 4:16-cv-00174; 4:16-cv-01940; 4:17-cv-01322. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/17/18. (JAB)
July 17, 2018 ***REMARK- Copy of #383 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, CY PRES DISTRIBUTION, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES mailed to the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation at Thurgood Marshall Federal Judiciary Building One Columbus Circle, NE Room G-255, North Lobby Washington, DC 20544-0005 as of this date. (CLO)
July 16, 2018 Filing 389 REPORT TO COURT ORDER re #383 Order Granting Final Approval of Settlement, Cy Pres Distribution, and Award of Attorneys Fees and Service Awards to the Class Representatives by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Driscoll, John)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' AND CLASS SETTLEMENT COUNSEL'S MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF ADDITIONAL LITIGATION EXPENSES INCURRED AFTER THE MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL WAS FILED - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' and Class Settlement Counsel's Motion for Reimbursement of Additional Litigation Expenses Incurred After the Motion for Final Approval was Filed #385 is GRANTED.The Court orders reimbursement for $12,185.39 in expenses to be distributed to Plaintiffs' counsel by the Settlement Administrator within seven (7) days of this Order as follows: Firm Amount : Heninger Garrison Davis, LLC - $8,667.63 ; Rosen Law Firm - $3,517.76. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the July 2, 2018 deadline for filing a second notice of accounting with the Court to account for and document the distributions done with the Reserve is CONTINUED to Monday, July 16, 2018. The Court shall maintain continuing jurisdiction over these proceedings for the benefit of the Class as defined in this Order. ( Response to Court due by 7/16/2018.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 06/29/18. (KKS)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER:IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that any objections to Plaintiffs' and Class Settlement Counsel's Motion for Reimbursement of Additional Litigation Expenses Incurred After the Motion for Final Approval was Filed (Doc. No. #385 ) must be filed no later than Monday, June 25, 2018. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/20/2018. (CLO)
June 18, 2018 Filing 386 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #385 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pf's and Class Settlement Counsel's Motion for Reimbursement of Add'l Litigation Expenses Incurred after the Motion for Final Approval was Filed filed by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Driscoll, John)
June 18, 2018 Filing 385 First MOTION for Attorney Fees Pf's and Class Settlement Counsel's Motion for Reimbursement of Add'l Litigation Expenses Incurred after the Motion for Final Approval was Filed by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John)
February 2, 2018 Filing 384 REPORT TO COURT ORDER re #383 Order Granting Final Approval of Settlement, Cy Pres Distribution, and Award of Attorneys Fees and Service Awards to the Class Representatives by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Driscoll, John)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, CY PRES DISTRIBUTION, AND AWARD OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES (SEE ORDER) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/20/2017. (CLO)
November 20, 2017 Filing 382 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Ross: Settlement Conference held on 11/20/2017. Parties present for Final Approval Hearing. Discussion held. Order to issue. (Court Reporter:Lisa Paczkowski, Lisa_Paczkowski@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7985) (FTR Gold: No) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attorney List) (CLO)
November 17, 2017 Filing 381 NOTICE Intent to Participate by Telephone: by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo Notice of Intent to Participate in the November 20, 2017 Final Approval Hearing by Telephone (Zimmerman, Thomas)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 380 ORDER: Counsel may participate by telephone at the Final Approval Hearing set on November 20, 2017, by filing a notice with the Court. Counsel are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810-9415 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 636-651-3185). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/15/17. (JAB)
November 14, 2017 Filing 379 RESPONSE TO COURT ORDER re #378 Scheduling Order,, by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Driscoll, John)
November 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 378 ORDER: In their Memorandum of Law in Support of Final Approval of Settlement (Doc. No. #368 ), Plaintiffs' Class Settlement Counsel have indicated the parties intent to jointly present to the Court a set of Charities as cy pres award nominees at the Final Fairness Hearing set for November 20, 2017. Counsel further state that the parties could propose the Charities to be nominated prior to the Approval Hearing should the Court prefer. Accordingly, the parties are hereby directed to file a list of their proposed Charities no later than Thursday, November 16, 2017. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/7/2017. (CLO)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Exhibits Under Seal #369 is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/23/2017. (CLO)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 376 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #366 MOTION for Leave to FILE PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMITATIONS by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Pursuant to the Courts requirements, Plaintiffs shall submit a paper courtesy copy to chambers within three (3) days of the date of this Order. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/23/2017. (CLO)
October 23, 2017 Filing 375 MEMORANDUM (CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE) re: #367 , #368 , #373 , #374 by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John) Modified on 10/24/2017 (CLO).
October 20, 2017 Filing 374 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #373 MOTION for Attorney Fees , REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES filed by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DECLARATION OF JOHN J. DRISCOLL IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS AND CLASS SETTLEMENT COUNSELS MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES, REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES)(Driscoll, John)
October 20, 2017 Filing 373 MOTION for Attorney Fees , REIMBURSEMENT OF LITIGATION EXPENSES, AND SERVICE AWARDS TO THE CLASS REPRESENTATIVES by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John)
October 20, 2017 Filing 372 SEALED DOCUMENT re #369 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (EXHIBITS TO MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, APPROVAL OF CY PRES DISTRIBUTION AND TO OVERRULE THE SINGLE OBJECTION TO THE SETTLEMENT), #368 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier. (Driscoll, John)
October 20, 2017 Filing 371 SEALED DOCUMENT re #369 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (EXHIBITS TO MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, APPROVAL OF CY PRES DISTRIBUTION AND TO OVERRULE THE SINGLE OBJECTION TO THE SETTLEMENT), #368 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John)
October 20, 2017 Filing 370 SEALED DOCUMENT re #369 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (EXHIBITS TO MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, APPROVAL OF CY PRES DISTRIBUTION AND TO OVERRULE THE SINGLE OBJECTION TO THE SETTLEMENT), #368 Memorandum in Support of Motion,, by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Grant Deloach, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John)
October 20, 2017 Filing 369 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document (EXHIBITS TO MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, APPROVAL OF CY PRES DISTRIBUTION AND TO OVERRULE THE SINGLE OBJECTION TO THE SETTLEMENT) by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John)
October 20, 2017 Filing 368 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #367 MOTION for Settlement (MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, APPROVAL OF CY PRES DISTRIBUTION AND TO OVERRULE THE SINGLE OBJECTION TO THE SETTLEMENT) filed by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - Objection, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Opt Out, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Opt Outs, #4 Exhibit Devery Declaration)(Driscoll, John)
October 20, 2017 Filing 367 MOTION for Settlement (MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, APPROVAL OF CY PRES DISTRIBUTION AND TO OVERRULE THE SINGLE OBJECTION TO THE SETTLEMENT) by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John)
October 20, 2017 Filing 366 MOTION for Leave to FILE PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT IN EXCESS OF PAGE LIMITATIONS by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John)
October 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 365 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #364 Consent MOTION for Extension of OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND RELATED MEMORANDA filed by Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Gustavo Alfaro, Byron Goetting, Keith Macomber, John Hiles, III, Todd Witengier, Steven Coward, Marc Benefield, Christopher Russell, David Yagel, Brian Farr, Nhung Truong, Anthony Imbarrato, James Mike Shows, Britt Garrett, David Miller, Marvin Cabiness; GRANTED - SO ORDERED. (Response due 10/20/17). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/18/17. (KJS)
October 17, 2017 Filing 364 Consent MOTION for Extension of: OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND COSTS AND RELATED MEMORANDA by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John)
October 16, 2017 Filing 363 OBJECTION to Class Action Settlement (unredacted) re #354 Order on Motion for Settlement Movant Shawn M O'Malley . (KKS)
October 16, 2017 Filing 362 OBJECTION to Class Action Settlement (redacted) - #354 Order on Motion for Settlement by Movant Shawn M O'Malley. (KKS)
October 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER - The Court is in receipt of a written objection to the proposed Class Action Settlement. Upon review, the objection contains a number of personal data identifiers which appear to be not intended for inclusion in the public record. The Court finds that redacting the personal identifiers from the filing is the least restrictive means of promoting electronic access to case files while also protecting personal privacy interests. See E.D.Mo. L.R. 2.17. Accordingly, the Court will partially redact the written objection and direct the Clerk of Court to file it in this matter. In addition to the redacted filing, the Clerk of Court shall file under seal with the Court an unredacted copy of the written objection.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/16/17. (KKS)(cc: movant on 10/16/2017) (KKS).
August 28, 2017 Filing 360 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Doe312017 572 E. 184th Street Carson, CA 90746. Returned document(s): 359 Docket Text Order, Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. **Because this address is insufficient, no future orders will be mailed to this party at this address. (KKS)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 359 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #358 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Helen C. Looney by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Looney, Helen) ; ORDERED GRANTED, Attorney Helen Claire Looney terminated. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/17/2017. (CLO)
August 18, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 359. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Fri Aug 18 09:54:45 CDT 2017 (Olliges, Chelsea)
August 17, 2017 Filing 358 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Helen C. Looney by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Looney, Helen)
August 8, 2017 Filing 357 TRANSCRIPT of #353 (MOTION HEARING) held on 7/21/2017 before Judge John A. Ross. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Paczkowski, Lisa_Paczkowski@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7985. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/8/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/6/2017. (CLO)
July 31, 2017 Filing 356 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Doe 312017. Returned document(s): 347 Docket Text Order,, #348 Order,, #354 Order. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (JAB)
July 25, 2017 Filing 355 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Doe312017, 572 E. 184th Street Carson, CA 90746. Returned document : #345 Order. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (KKS)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT, DIRECTING NOTICE TO THE CLASS, SCHEDULING A FINAL APPROVAL HEARING, AND CERTIFYING A SETTLEMENT CLASS. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/21/2017. (CLO)
July 21, 2017 Filing 353 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Ross: Motion Hearing held on 7/21/2017 re #343 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Discussion held. Order to issue.( In Court Hearing set for 11/20/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross.). (Court Reporter:Lisa Paczkowski) (FTR Gold: No) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attorney List) (CLO)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 354. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Fri Jul 21 14:55:46 CDT 2017 (Olliges, Chelsea)
July 20, 2017 Filing 352 NOTICE Declaration of Richard P. Cassetta: by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc. re #343 MOTION for Settlement for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cassetta, Richard) Modified text on 7/20/2017 (KKS).
July 20, 2017 Filing 351 NOTICE Supplemental Declaration in Support of Motion for Preliminary Approval: by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brian Devery)(Dowd, Douglas)
July 19, 2017 Filing 350 NOTICE of Intent to Participate by Telephone: by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo Notice of Intent to Participate in the July 21, 2017 Preliminary Approval Conference by Telephone (Zimmerman, Thomas)
July 19, 2017 Filing 349 NOTICE Intent to Appear Telephonically at July 21, 2017 Hearing: by Plaintiffs Marc Benefield, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Nhung Truong (Hinton, Christopher)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER: Counsel may participate by telephone at the July 21, 2017 hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by filing a notice with the Court. Counsel are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877- 810-9415 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 636-651-3185). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/19/2017. (CLO)
July 19, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 348. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Wed Jul 19 10:30:41 CDT 2017 (Olliges, Chelsea)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 347 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #346 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support in Excess of Page Limitations by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Dowd, Douglas) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/17/2017. (CLO)
July 17, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 347. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Mon Jul 17 10:00:39 CDT 2017 (Olliges, Chelsea)
July 14, 2017 Filing 346 MOTION for Leave to File Memorandum in Support in Excess of Page Limitations by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Dowd, Douglas)
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement (Doc. No. #343 ) is set for hearing on Friday, July 21, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12N. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/14/2017. (CLO)
July 14, 2017 Filing 344 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #343 MOTION for Settlement for Preliminary Approval of Settlement on behalf of Plaintiffs filed by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of W. Lewis Garrison, Jr., #2 Declaration of Layn R. Phillips, #3 Declaration of Steven Weisbrot)(Dowd, Douglas) Modified text on 7/17/2017 (CLO).
July 14, 2017 Filing 343 MOTION for Settlement for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement, #2 Exhibit 1A - Claim Form, #3 Exhibit 1B - Notice Plan, #4 Exhibit 1C - Long Form Notice, #5 Exhibit 1D - Summary Publication Notice, #6 Exhibit 1E - Proposed Preliminary Approval Order, #7 Exhibit 1F - Internet Banner Ads, #8 Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order, #9 Exhibit 3 - Notice Plan)(Dowd, Douglas) Modified docket text on 7/17/2017 (CLO).
July 14, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 345. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Fri Jul 14 14:44:10 CDT 2017 (Olliges, Chelsea)
July 5, 2017 Filing 342 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Doe 312017 572 E. 184th Street Carson, CA 90746. Returned document - #341 Order. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (KKS)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 341. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Wed Jun 21 08:29:42 CDT 2017 (Bernsen, John)
June 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER: At the request of the parties and for good cause shown, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the status conference scheduled for July 7, 2017 is continued, to resume with the regularly scheduled status conference on August 4, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12N. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/20/17. (JAB)
June 20, 2017 Filing 340 Joint MOTION to Continue July Status Conference by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Dowd, Douglas)
May 8, 2017 Filing 339 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to John Doe 312017. Returned document(s): #338 Scheduling Order,. Could not verify new address and mail was not resent. (CLO)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 338 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' Joint Motion to Continue May and June Status Conferences #337 is GRANTED. The next status conference is scheduled for July 7, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12N. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/25/2017. (CLO)
April 25, 2017 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 338. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification. Tue Apr 25 13:24:00 CDT 2017 (Olliges, Chelsea)
April 24, 2017 Filing 337 Joint MOTION to Continue May and June Status Conferences by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
April 14, 2017 Filing 336 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: Ashley Madison Customer Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 2669: Doe 312017 v. Avid Life Media, Inc., C.D. California, Case No. 2:1702492, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:17-cv-01322-JAR. (DLB)
April 13, 2017 Filing 335 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: Ashley Madison Customer Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 2669: Doe 312017 v. Avid Life Media, Inc., C.D. California, Case No. 2:1702492. (DLB)
April 6, 2017 Filing 334 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Tara K. King by Plaintiff Jane Doe. Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR, 4:15-cv-01132-JAR(King, Tara)
February 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 333 ORDER: At the request of the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the April 7, 2017 status conference is CANCELLED. The next status conference is scheduled for May 5, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12N. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/28/2017. (CLO)
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 332 ORDER re #330 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Thadeaus G Scharf, III. SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/16/17. (JAB)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and/or Stay and Compel Arbitration scheduled for February 17, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. is CONTINUED, to be reset upon further order of the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the March 3, 2017 status conference is CANCELLED. The next status conference is scheduled for April 7, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12N. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/13/2017. (CLO)
February 10, 2017 Filing 330 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Thadeaus G Scharf, III Without Prejudice (Linam, Stephanie)
January 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 329 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #327 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document regarding Sealed Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Avid's Reply Brief by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard) ; ORDERED GRANTED Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/31/17. (JAB)
January 30, 2017 Filing 328 SEALED DOCUMENT re #323 MOTION to Strike #314 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,, #317 Reply to Response to Motion, #316 Sealed Document,,,,,, SEALED Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Avid's Reply Brief by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Cordas v. Uber)(Cassetta, Richard)
January 30, 2017 Filing 327 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document regarding Sealed Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike Avid's Reply Brief by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
January 30, 2017 Filing 326 RESPONSE to Motion re #323 MOTION to Strike #314 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,, #317 Reply to Response to Motion, #316 Sealed Document,,,,,, REDACTED VERSION filed by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Cordas v. Uber)(Cassetta, Richard)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER: Following a status conference with counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that oral argument on Defendants Motion to Dismiss and/or Stay and Compel Arbitration is scheduled for Friday, February 17, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12N. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the February 3, 2017 status conference is CANCELLED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendants are granted until January 30, 2017 to respond to Plaintiffs Motion to Strike, or Alternatively, Their Objection, To Avids Reply Brief (Doc. No. 323). Plaintiffs shall have seven (7) days to file any reply. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/6/17. (JAB)
January 6, 2017 Filing 324 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Ross: Status Conference held on 1/6/2017. Order to follow. (Court Reporter:Lisa Paczkowski) (FTR Gold: No) (Attachments: #1 Attorney Llst) (JAB)
January 6, 2017 Filing 323 MOTION to Strike #314 Reply to Response to Motion,,,,,, #317 Reply to Response to Motion, #316 Sealed Document,,,,,, by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (McDonough, James)
January 6, 2017 Filing 322 NOTICE INTENT TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE AT THE JANUARY 6, 2017 STATUS CONFERENCE: by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro (McDonough, James)
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 321 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #315 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/4/17. (JAB)
January 4, 2017 Filing 320 NOTICE Intent to Participate by Telephone: by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo (Zimmerman, Thomas)
January 3, 2017 Filing 319 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone at the January 6, 2017 Status Conference: by Defendant Noel Biderman (Dumain, Ian)
January 3, 2017 Filing 318 NOTICE by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc. JOINT PROPOSED AGENDA for January Status Conference (Cassetta, Richard)
December 16, 2016 Filing 317 REPLY to Response to Motion re (233 in 4:15-md-02669-JAR) MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Noel Biderman. Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR et al.(Dumain, Ian)
December 16, 2016 Filing 316 SEALED DOCUMENT Reply in Support of Motion to Dismiss or to Stay and Compel Arbitration (and Sealed Attachments) by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cassetta Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Cassetta Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Cassetta Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Cassetta Declaration, #5 Affidavit Jiwan Declaration, #6 Exhibit 1 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #7 Exhibit 2 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #8 Exhibit 3 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #9 Exhibit 4 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #10 Exhibit 5 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #11 Exhibit 6 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #12 Exhibit 7 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #13 Exhibit 8 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #14 Exhibit 9 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #15 Exhibit 10 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #16 Exhibit 11 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #17 Exhibit 12 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #18 Exhibit 13 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #19 Exhibit 14 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #20 Exhibit 15 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #21 Exhibit 16 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #22 Exhibit 17 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #23 Exhibit 18 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #24 Exhibit 19 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #25 Exhibit 20 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #26 Exhibit 21 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #27 Exhibit 22 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed), #28 Exhibit 23 to Jiwan Declaration (sealed))(Cassetta, Richard)
December 16, 2016 Filing 315 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
December 16, 2016 Filing 314 REPLY to Response to Motion re #229 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration (Redacted) filed by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Cassetta Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 to Cassetta Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to Cassetta Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to Cassetta Declaration, #5 Affidavit Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #6 Exhibit 1 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #7 Exhibit 2 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #8 Exhibit 3 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #9 Exhibit 4 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #10 Exhibit 5 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #11 Exhibit 6 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #12 Exhibit 7 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #13 Exhibit 8 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #14 Exhibit 9 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #15 Exhibit 10 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #16 Exhibit 11 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #17 Exhibit 12 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #18 Exhibit 13 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #19 Exhibit 14 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #20 Exhibit 15 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #21 Exhibit 16 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #22 Exhibit 17 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #23 Exhibit 18 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #24 Exhibit 19 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #25 Exhibit 20 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #26 Exhibit 21 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #27 Exhibit 22 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted), #28 Exhibit 23 to Jiwan Declaration (redacted))(Cassetta, Richard)
December 16, 2016 Filing 313 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: Ashley Madison Customer Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 2669: Plaisance v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, E.D. Louisiana, Case No. 2:16cv16077 opened as E.D. Missouri Case No. 4:16cv1940 JAR. (DLB)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #311 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time, up to and including Monday December 19, 2016, to file their Reply in Support of theirMotion to Stay and/or Compel Arbitration. ( Response to Court due by 12/19/2016.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/12/16. (KKS)
December 12, 2016 Filing 311 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by all Defendants by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
December 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 310 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #309 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard) filed by Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/2/2016. (CLO)
December 2, 2016 Filing 309 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
November 30, 2016 Filing 308 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: Ashley Madison Customer Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 2669: Plaisance v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, E.D. Louisiana, Case No. 2:16cv16077. (DLB)
November 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER: In light of the parties notice to the Court that they have no agenda items for the December 2, 2016 status conference, and the briefing schedule for Avids pending Motion to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, the December 2, 2016 status conference is CANCELLED. The next status conference is scheduled for January 6, 2017 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12N. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/28/16. (JAB)
November 28, 2016 Filing 306 NOTICE by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc. Joint Notice that the Parties Have No Agenda Items for the December 2nd Status Conference (Cassetta, Richard)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 305 Docket Text ORDERs: GRANTING #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits by Plaintiffs ; GRANTING #271 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/21/16. (KKS)
November 18, 2016 Filing 304 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 44 - Jiwan Errata Sheet by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 303 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 43 - AVID00000946 by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 302 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 42 - AVID00001010 by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 301 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 41 - AVID00000498 by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 300 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 40 - Yagel Declaration by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 299 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 25 - Cabiness Declaration by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 298 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 24 - Benefield Declaration by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 297 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 22 - Yagel Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 296 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 21 - Witengier Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 295 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 20 - Truong Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 294 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 19 - Shows Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 293 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 18 - Russell Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 292 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 17 - Miller Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 291 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 16 - Macomber Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 290 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 15 - Lisuzzo Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 289 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 14 - Jack Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 288 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 13 - Imbarrato Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 287 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 12 - Hiles Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 286 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 11 - Goetting Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 285 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 10 - Garrett Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 284 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 9 - Farr Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 283 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 8 - Coward Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 282 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 7 - Cabiness Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 281 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 6 - Benefield Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 280 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 5 - Alfaro Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 279 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 4 - Sign Up Screens by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 278 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 3 - Avid Supplemental Answers to Interrogatories by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 277 SEALED DOCUMENT re #266 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document including Sealed Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or to Stay and Compel Arbitration, and Sealed Attachments and Exhibits thereto, #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits Exhibit 2 - Jiwan Chronology by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 276 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting ExhibitsEXHIBIT 1 by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas) Modified text on 11/21/2016 (KKS).
November 18, 2016 Filing 275 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits DECLARATION OF JAMES F. MCDONOUGH, III by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas) Modified text on 11/21/2016 (KKS).
November 18, 2016 Filing 274 SEALED DOCUMENT re #272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 273 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #233 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration, #229 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James McDonough - REDACTED, #2 Exhibit 1 - Jiwan Deposition - REDACTED, #3 Exhibit 2 - Jiwan Account Chronology - REDACTED, #4 Exhibit 3 - Supplemental Answers and Objections to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #5 Exhibit 4 - Sign Up Screens - REDACTED, #6 Exhibit 5 - Alfaro Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #7 Exhibit 6 - Benefield Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #8 Exhibit 7 - Cabiness Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #9 Exhibit 8 - Coward Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #10 Exhibit 9 - Farr Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #11 Exhibit 10 - Garrett Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #12 Exhibit 11 - Goetting Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #13 Exhibit 12 - Hiles Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #14 Exhibit 13 - Imbarrato Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #15 Exhibit 14 - Jack Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #16 Exhibit 15 - Lisuzzo Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #17 Exhibit 16 - Macomber Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #18 Exhibit 17 - Miller Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #19 Exhibit 18 - Russell Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #20 Exhibit 19 - Shows Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #21 Exhibit 20 - Truong Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #22 Exhibit 21 - Witengier Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #23 Exhibit 22 - Yagel Answers to Interrogatories - REDACTED, #24 Exhibit 23 - Alfaro Declaration, #25 Exhibit 24 - Benefield Declaration - REDACTED, #26 Exhibit 25 - Cabiness Declaration - REDACTED, #27 Exhibit 26 - Coward Declaration, #28 Exhibit 27 - Farr Declaration, #29 Exhibit 28 - Garrett Declaration, #30 Exhibit 29 - Goetting Declaration, #31 Exhibit 30 - Hiles Declaration, #32 Exhibit 31 - Imbarrato Declaration, #33 Exhibit 32 - Jack Declaration, #34 Exhibit 33 - Lisuzzo Declaration, #35 Exhibit 34 - Macomber Declaration, #36 Exhibit 35 - Miller Declaration, #37 Exhibit 36 - Russell Declaration, #38 Exhibit 37 - Shows Declaration, #39 Exhibit 38 - Truong Declaration, #40 Exhibit 39 - Witengier Declaration, #41 Exhibit 40 - Yagel Declaration, #42 Exhibit 41 - AVID 00000498 - REDACTED, #43 Exhibit 42 - AVID 00001010 - REDACTED, #44 Exhibit 43 - AVID 00000946 - REDACTED, #45 Exhibit 44 - Jiwan Errata Sheet - REDACTED)(Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 272 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, Attorney Declaration and Supporting Exhibits by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 18, 2016 Filing 271 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 270 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #268 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #229 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard) filed by Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED, ( Response to Court due by 12/15/2016.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/16/2016. (CLO)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 269 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #266 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document including Sealed Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or to Stay and Compel Arbitration, and Sealed Attachments and Exhibits thereto by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard) filed by Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/16/2016. (CLO)
November 16, 2016 Filing 268 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #229 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
November 15, 2016 Filing 267 SEALED DOCUMENT re #232 Memorandum in Support of Motion (SEALED),,,,,,, #266 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document including Sealed Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or to Stay and Compel Arbitration, and Sealed Attachments and Exhibits thereto by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Jiwan Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #13 Exhibit L to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #14 Exhibit M to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #15 Exhibit N to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #16 Exhibit O to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #17 Exhibit P to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #18 Exhibit Q to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #19 Exhibit R to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #20 Exhibit S to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #21 Exhibit T to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #22 Affidavit Cassetta Declaration, #23 Exhibit A to Cassetta Declaration, #24 Exhibit B to Cassetta Declaration, #25 Exhibit C to Cassetta Declaration, #26 Exhibit D to Cassetta Declaration, #27 Exhibit E to Cassetta Declaration, #28 Exhibit F to Cassetta Declaration, #29 Exhibit G to Cassetta Declaration, #30 Exhibit H to Cassetta Declaration, #31 Exhibit I to Cassetta Declaration, #32 Exhibit J to Cassetta Declaration, #33 Exhibit K to Cassetta Declaration, #34 Exhibit L to Cassetta Declaration, #35 Exhibit M to Cassetta Declaration, #36 Exhibit N to Cassetta Declaration, #37 Exhibit O to Cassetta Declaration, #38 Exhibit P to Cassetta Declaration)(Cassetta, Richard)
November 15, 2016 Filing 266 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document including Sealed Amended Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or to Stay and Compel Arbitration, and Sealed Attachments and Exhibits thereto by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
November 15, 2016 Filing 265 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #229 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration AMENDED MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT [UNSEALED VERSION] filed by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Amended Jiwan Declaration- REDACTED, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A- REDACTED- to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #10 Exhibit Exhibit I to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #11 Exhibit Exhibit J to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #12 Exhibit Exhibit K to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #13 Exhibit Exhibit L to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #14 Exhibit Exhibit M to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #15 Exhibit Exhibit N to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #16 Exhibit Exhibit O to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #17 Exhibit Exhibit P to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #18 Exhibit Exhibit Q to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #19 Exhibit Exhibit R- REDACTED- to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #20 Exhibit Exhibit S to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #21 Exhibit Exhibit T to Amended Jiwan Declaration, #22 Affidavit Cassetta Declaration- REDACTED, #23 Exhibit Exhibit A to Cassetta Declaration, #24 Exhibit Exhibit B to Cassetta Declaration, #25 Exhibit Exhibit C to Cassetta Declaration, #26 Exhibit Exhibit D to Cassetta Declaration, #27 Exhibit Exhibit E to Cassetta Declaration, #28 Exhibit Exhibit F to Cassetta Declaration, #29 Exhibit Exhibit G to Cassetta Declaration, #30 Exhibit Exhibit H to Cassetta Declaration, #31 Exhibit Exhibit I to Cassetta Declaration, #32 Exhibit Exhibit J to Cassetta Declaration, #33 Exhibit Exhibit K to Cassetta Declaration, #34 Exhibit Exhibit L to Cassetta Declaration, #35 Exhibit Exhibit M to Cassetta Declaration, #36 Exhibit Exhibit N to Cassetta Declaration, #37 Exhibit Exhibit O- REDACTED- to Cassetta Declaration, #38 Exhibit Exhibit P to Cassetta Declaration)(Cassetta, Richard)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 264 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #263 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #229 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Dowd, Douglas) ; ORDERED GRANTED, ( Response to Court due by 11/18/2016.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/15/2016. (CLO)
November 15, 2016 Filing 263 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #229 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Dowd, Douglas)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Avid's Motion for Leave to Amend #258 is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/15/2016. (CLO)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 261 ORDER: In light of the parties' notice to the Court that they have no agenda items for the November 18, 2016 status conference, and Avid's pending Motion to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration which is still being briefed, the November 18, 2016 status conference is CANCELLED. The next status conference is scheduled for December 2, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12N. Status Conference set for 12/2/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/15/2016. (CLO)
November 14, 2016 Filing 260 NOTICE by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc. Joint Notice that the Parties Have No Agenda Items for the November 18 Status Conference (Cassetta, Richard)
November 14, 2016 Filing 259 (DOCUMENT DELETED)NOTICE by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc. Modified on 11/14/2016-document deleted due to attorney filing error-Document refiled as doc #260 . (JAB).
November 7, 2016 Filing 258 MOTION to Amend/Correct #230 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,,,,,, to Dismiss or Stay and Compel Arbitration, and Declaration of Rizwan Jiwan, by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Cassetta, Richard)
November 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 257 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #255 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR, 4:15-cv-01132-JAR(Kinghorn, Andrew) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/7/16. (JAB)
November 7, 2016 Filing 256 ENTRY of Appearance by Tara K. King for Plaintiff Jane Doe. Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR, 4:15-cv-01132-JAR(King, Tara)
November 7, 2016 Filing 255 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR, 4:15-cv-01132-JAR(Kinghorn, Andrew)
November 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 254 Docket Text ORDER: Granting #253 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #229 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration, #233 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration by Plaintiffs; Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motions to Stay and Compel Arbitration shall be filed no later than November 15, 2016, and Defendants' Replies in Support of the Motions to Stay and Compel Arbitration shall be filed no later than December 12, 2016. ( Response to Court due by 11/15/2016.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/03/16. (KKS)
November 2, 2016 Filing 253 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #229 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration, #233 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John)
October 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 252 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Avid Dating Life Inc.'s Consent Motion to Continue November Status Conference #251 is GRANTED. The November 4, 2016 status conference is continued to November 18, 2016 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12N.( Status Conference set for 11/18/2016 11:00 AM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/21/16. (KKS)
October 21, 2016 Filing 251 Consent MOTION to Continue November Status Conference by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 250 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #249 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Philip Sholtz by Plaintiff Jane Doe. Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR, 4:15-cv-01132-JAR(Sholtz, Philip) filed by Jane Doe ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/11/2016. (CLO)
October 7, 2016 Filing 249 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Philip Sholtz by Plaintiff Jane Doe. Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR, 4:15-cv-01132-JAR(Sholtz, Philip)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 248 ORDER: In light of the parties' notice to the Court that they have no agenda items for the October 7, 2016 status conference, the October 7, 2016 status conference is CANCELLED. The next status conference is scheduled for November 4, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 12N.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/3/16. (KKS)
October 3, 2016 Filing 247 MEMORANDUM Joint Proposed Agenda For October 7, 2016 Status Conference by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Dowd, Douglas)
September 26, 2016 Filing 246 TRANSCRIPT of #240 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 9/9/2016 before Judge Ross. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Paczkowski, Lisa_Paczkowski@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7985. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/27/2016. (CLO)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 245 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE: #244 SO ORDERED. Plaintiff David Poyet (Case No. 4: 15-cv-01929-JAR), by and through his attorneys, hereby dismisses this action without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41 (a)(l )(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/20/2016. (CLO)
September 16, 2016 Filing 244 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Poyet Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR, 4:15-cv-01929-JAR(Kandinov, Leonid)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 243 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants Motions to Stay and Compel Arbitration shall be filed no later than November 7, 2016. Defendants Replies in Support of the Motions to Stay and Compel Arbitration shall be filed no later than November 30, 2016. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/15/16. (JAB)
September 14, 2016 Filing 242 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. Joint Report Regarding the Jiwan Deposition and Proposed Briefing Schedule on Motion to Stay and Compel Arbitration. (Cassetta, Richard)
September 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 241 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs request for extension of time to respond to the motions to dismiss or stay and compel arbitration filed by Defendants Avid Dating Life Inc., Avid Life Media Inc., and Noel Biderman is GRANTED. The parties shall have five (5) days from the date of this Order to report to the Court on the scheduling of the deposition of Rizwan Jiwan and the filing of a response to Defendants pending motions, at which time the Court will enter an Order consistent therewith. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/9/16. (JAB)
September 9, 2016 Filing 240 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Ross: Status Conference held on 9/9/2016. Order to follow. (Court Reporter:Lisa Paczkowski) (FTR Gold: No) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attorney List) (JAB)
September 7, 2016 Filing 239 NOTICE Intent to Participate by Telephone: by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo (Zimmerman, Thomas)
September 6, 2016 Filing 238 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone: by Plaintiff David Miller (Marcussen, Carin)
September 6, 2016 Filing 237 MEMORANDUM Joint Proposed Agenda For September 9, 2016 Status Conference by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Dowd, Douglas)
September 6, 2016 Filing 236 NOTICE Intent to Participate by Telephone: by Plaintiff Christopher Russell (Mason, Gary)
August 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Avids Motion to File Documents Under Seal #231 is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/30/2016. (CLO)
August 29, 2016 Filing 234 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #233 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Defendant Noel Biderman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Ian M. Dumain, #2 Exhibit 1A - Exhibit A to Dumain Decl., #3 Exhibit 1B - Exhibit B to Dumain Decl., #4 Exhibit 1C - Exhibit C to Dumain Decl., #5 Exhibit 1D - Exhibit D to Dumain Decl., #6 Exhibit 1E - Exhibit E to Dumain Decl., #7 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Noel Biderman)(Dumain, Ian)
August 29, 2016 Filing 233 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration by Defendant Noel Biderman. (Dumain, Ian)
August 29, 2016 Filing 232 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion (SEALED) re #229 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Rizwan Jiwan (not redacted), #2 Exhibit 1A- Exh. A to Jiwan Decl. (not redacted), #3 Exhibit 1B- Exh B. to Jiwan Decl., #4 Exhibit 1C- Exh. C to Jiwan Decl., #5 Exhibit 1D- Exh. D to Jiwan Decl., #6 Exhibit 1E- Exh. E to Jiwan Decl., #7 Exhibit 1F- Exh. F to Jiwan Decl., #8 Exhibit 1G- Exh. G to Jiwan Decl., #9 Exhibit 1H- Exh. H to Jiwan Decl., #10 Exhibit 1I- Exh. I to Jiwan Decl., #11 Exhibit 1J- Exh. J to Jiwan Decl., #12 Exhibit 1K- Exh. K to Jiwan Decl., #13 Exhibit 1L- Exh. L to Jiwan Decl., #14 Exhibit 1M- Exh. M to Jiwan Decl., #15 Exhibit 1N- Exh. N to Jiwan Decl., #16 Exhibit 1O- Exh. O to Jiwan Decl., #17 Exhibit 1P- Exh. P to Jiwan Decl., #18 Exhibit 1Q- Exh. Q to Jiwan Decl., #19 Exhibit 1R- Exh. R to Jiwan Decl. (not redacted), #20 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Richard Cassetta (not redacted), #21 Exhibit 2A- Exh. A to Cassetta Decl., #22 Exhibit 2B- Exh. B to Cassetta Decl., #23 Exhibit 2C- Exh. C to Cassetta Decl., #24 Exhibit 2D- Exh. D to Cassetta Decl., #25 Exhibit 2E- Exh. E to Cassetta Decl., #26 Exhibit 2F- Exh. F to Cassetta Decl., #27 Exhibit 2G- Exh. G to Cassetta Decl., #28 Exhibit 2H- Exh. H to Cassetta Decl., #29 Exhibit 2I- Exh. I to Cassetta Decl., #30 Exhibit 2J- Exh. J to Cassetta Decl., #31 Exhibit 2K- Exh. K to Cassetta Decl., #32 Exhibit 2L- Exh. L to Cassetta Decl., #33 Exhibit 2M- Exh. M to Cassetta Decl., #34 Exhibit 2N- Exh. N to Cassetta Decl., #35 Exhibit 2O- Exh. O to Cassetta Decl. (not redacted), #36 Exhibit 2P- Exh. P to Cassetta Decl.)(Cassetta, Richard)
August 29, 2016 Filing 231 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document Regarding Sealed Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss or to Stay and Compel Arbitration by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
August 29, 2016 Filing 230 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #229 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration (REDACTED) filed by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1- Declaration of Rizwan Jiwan (REDACTED), #2 Exhibit 1A- Exh. A to Jiwan Decl. (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit 1B- Exh. B to Jiwan Decl., #4 Exhibit 1C- Exh. C to Jiwan Decl., #5 Exhibit 1D- Exh. D to Jiwan Decl., #6 Exhibit 1E- Exh. E to Jiwan Decl., #7 Exhibit 1F- Exh. F to Jiwan Decl., #8 Exhibit 1G- Exh. G to Jiwan Decl., #9 Exhibit 1H- Exh. H to Jiwan Decl., #10 Exhibit 1I- Exh. I to Jiwan Decl., #11 Exhibit 1J- Exh. J to Jiwan Decl., #12 Exhibit 1K- Exh. K to Jiwan Decl., #13 Exhibit 1L- Exh. L to Jiwan Decl., #14 Exhibit 1M- Exh. M to Jiwan Decl., #15 Exhibit 1N- Exh. N to Jiwan Decl., #16 Exhibit 1O- Exh. O to Jiwan Decl., #17 Exhibit 1P- Exh. P to Jiwan Decl., #18 Exhibit 1Q- Exh. Q to Jiwan Decl., #19 Exhibit 1R- Exh. R to Jiwan Decl. (REDACTED), #20 Exhibit 2- Declaration of Richard Cassetta (REDACTED), #21 Exhibit 2A- Exh. A to Cassetta Decl., #22 Exhibit 2B- Exh. B to Cassetta Decl., #23 Exhibit 2C- Exh. C to Cassetta Decl., #24 Exhibit 2D- Exh. D to Cassetta Decl., #25 Exhibit 2E- Exh. E to Cassetta Decl., #26 Exhibit 2F- Exh. F to Cassetta Decl., #27 Exhibit 2G- Exh. G to Cassetta Decl., #28 Exhibit 2H- Exh. H to Cassetta Decl., #29 Exhibit 2I- Exh. I to Cassetta Decl., #30 Exhibit 2J- Exh. J to Cassetta Decl., #31 Exhibit 2K- Exh. K to Cassetta Decl., #32 Exhibit 2L- Exh. L to Cassetta Decl., #33 Exhibit 2M- Exh. M to Cassetta Decl., #34 Exhibit 2N- Exh. N to Cassetta Decl., #35 Exhibit 2O- Exh. O to Cassetta Decl. (REDACTED), #36 Exhibit 2P- Exh. P to Cassetta Decl.)(Cassetta, Richard)
August 29, 2016 Filing 229 MOTION to Dismiss Case or Stay and Compel Arbitration by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 228 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery #207 is GRANTED in part in accordance with the rulings herein.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/24/16. (KKS)
August 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 227 Docket Text ORDER: ORDERED GRANTING #225 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorneys Michael Loren Silverman and John Shannon Marrese by Plaintiff Michael Pauly.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/22/16. (KKS)
August 19, 2016 Filing 226 REPLY to Response to Motion re #207 MOTION to Compel Discovery On Arbitrability filed by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 8, #2 Exhibit 9, #3 Exhibit 10, #4 Exhibit 11, #5 Exhibit 12, #6 Exhibit 13)(Garrison, William)
August 19, 2016 Filing 225 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Michael Loren Silverman and John Shannon Marrese by Plaintiff Michael Pauly. (Marrese, John)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 224 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #202 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc... Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/18/16. (KKS)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 223 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #221 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard) filed by Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc., #215 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John) filed by Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Gustavo Alfaro, Byron Goetting, Keith Macomber, John Hiles, III, Todd Witengier, Steven Coward, Marc Benefield, Christopher Russell, David Yagel, Brian Farr, Nhung Truong, Anthony Imbarrato, James Mike Shows, Britt Garrett, David Miller, Marvin Cabiness ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/17/2016. (CLO)
August 16, 2016 Filing 222 SEALED DOCUMENT re #221 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document , #220 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Non-Redacted and Confidential Exhibit H to Avid's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
August 16, 2016 Filing 221 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
August 16, 2016 Filing 220 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #207 MOTION to Compel Discovery filed by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H (Redacted))(Cassetta, Richard)
August 16, 2016 Filing 219 TRANSCRIPT of #204 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on August 5, 2016 before Judge Ross. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Paczkowski, Lisa_Paczkowski@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7985. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/6/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/16/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/14/2016. (KXS)
August 15, 2016 Filing 218 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. Amendment to #207 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Replacement Ex. 3 - Redacted). (Driscoll, John)
August 15, 2016 Filing 217 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. Amendment to #207 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Replacement Ex. 2). (Driscoll, John)
August 15, 2016 Filing 216 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. Amendment to #207 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Replacement Ex. 1 - Redacted). (Driscoll, John)
August 15, 2016 Filing 215 Amended MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John)
August 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 214 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #206 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John) ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/10/2016. (CLO)
August 9, 2016 Filing 213 SEALED DOCUMENT re #207 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Ex. 6) by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Driscoll, John)
August 9, 2016 Filing 212 SEALED DOCUMENT re #207 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Ex. 5) by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Driscoll, John)
August 9, 2016 Filing 211 SEALED DOCUMENT re #207 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Ex. 4) by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Driscoll, John)
August 9, 2016 Filing 210 SEALED DOCUMENT re #207 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Ex. 3) by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Driscoll, John)
August 9, 2016 Filing 209 SEALED DOCUMENT re #207 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Ex. 2) by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Driscoll, John)
August 9, 2016 Filing 208 SEALED DOCUMENT re #207 MOTION to Compel Discovery (Ex. 1) by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro. (Driscoll, John)
August 9, 2016 Filing 207 MOTION to Compel Discovery by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex 1 (placeholder), #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 (placeholder), #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 (placeholder), #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 (placeholder), #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 (placeholder), #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 (placeholder), #7 Exhibit Ex. 7)(Driscoll, John)
August 9, 2016 Filing 206 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marc Benefield, Marvin Cabiness, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Byron Goetting, John Hiles, III, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Matthew Lisuzzo, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Christopher Russell, James Mike Shows, Nhung Truong, Todd Witengier, David Yagel. (Driscoll, John)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 205 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer on Monday, August 8, 2016 and file any motions to compel discovery by Tuesday, August 9, 2016. Each side shall then have seven (7) days to respond and three (3) days to reply. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Noel Biderman is granted leave to file a separate motion or brief on the issue of arbitration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs co-lead counsel are directed to contact counsel for Plaintiffs who are still in the case but not joined in the First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint and update the Court on their status. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the September 2, 2016 status conference is rescheduled for Friday, September 9, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/5/16. (JAB)
August 5, 2016 Filing 204 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Ross: Status Conference held on 8/5/2016. Discovery matters discussed. Deadlines set. Order to issue. (Court Reporter:Lisa Paczkowski) (FTR Gold: No) (Attachments: #1 Attachment attorney list) (JAB)
August 4, 2016 Filing 203 NOTICE Intent to Appear By Telephone at the August 5, 2016 Hearing: by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, Marvin Cabiness, Byron Goetting, Anthony Imbarrato, Paul Jack, Keith Macomber, David Yagel (McDonough, James)
August 4, 2016 Filing 202 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
August 3, 2016 Filing 201 NOTICE of Intent to Appear by Telephone at the August 5, 2016 Status Conference: by Plaintiffs Marc Benefield, Steven Coward, Brian Farr, Britt Garrett, Nhung Truong (Hinton, Christopher)
August 3, 2016 Filing 200 NOTICE by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo Notice of Intent to Participate in the August 5, 2016 Status Conference by Telephone (Zimmerman, Thomas)
August 2, 2016 Filing 199 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: Ashley Madison Customer Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 2669: Scharf v. Avid Life Media Inc et al, E.D. Arkansas, Case No. 5:1600225 opened as EDMO Case 4:16-cv-01260-JAR. (DLB)
August 2, 2016 Filing 198 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: Ashley Madison Customer Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 2669: Scharf v. Avid Life Media Inc et al, E.D. Arkansas, Case No. 5:1600225. (DLB)
August 2, 2016 Filing 197 NOTICE by Plaintiff Christopher Russell of Intent to Appear by Telephone (Mason, Gary)
August 1, 2016 Filing 196 NOTICE Joint Proposed Agenda: by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc. (Cassetta, Richard)
August 1, 2016 Filing 195 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone: by Plaintiff David Miller re #75 Order,,,,, (Marcussen, Carin)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER OF CONFIDENTIALITY. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/22/2016. (CLO)
July 21, 2016 Filing 193 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cassetta, Richard)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER: In light of the parties notice to the Court that they have no agenda items for the July 8, 2016 status conference, the July 8 status conference is CANCELLED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/5/16. (JAB)
July 5, 2016 Filing 191 NOTICE by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc. that the Parties Have No Agenda Items for July 8th Status Conference (Cassetta, Richard)
July 1, 2016 Filing 190 NOTICE of Intent to Appear by Telephone: by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo (Zimmerman, Thomas)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply: 1. No later than July 8, 2016, the parties shall serve any written discovery reasonably necessary to address Defendants' contemplated motion(s) to stay and compel arbitration. 2. No later than July 22, 2016, Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' interrogatories. 3. No later than August 5, 2016, Plaintiffs shall respond to Defendants' document requests and any requests to admit, and produce documents responsive to Defendants' requests to produce. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiffs' document requests, interrogatories, and any requests to admit, and produce documents responsive to Plaintiffs' requests to produce. 4. No later than August 29, 2016, Defendants shall file their motion to stay and compel arbitration. 5. No later than thirty days after Defendants file their motion to stay and compel arbitration, Plaintiffs shall file their memorandum in opposition to the motion to stay and compel arbitration. 6. No later than fourteen days after Plaintiffs file their memorandum in opposition to the motion to stay and compel arbitration, Defendants shall file their reply in support of their motion to stay and compel arbitration. 7. In the event the Court denies Defendants' motion to stay and compel arbitration, then the deadline for Defendants to answer or raise any other defenses to Plaintiffs First Amended Consolidated Class Action Complaint, including any motions brought under Rule 12(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, shall be addressed by the parties and the Court at that time. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 8/29/2016. Response to Court due by 7/8/2016.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/1/16. (KKS)
July 1, 2016 Filing 188 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone: by Plaintiff David Miller (Marcussen, Carin)
July 1, 2016 Filing 187 NOTICE Intent to Appear Telephonically for Status Conference: by Plaintiff Christopher Russell (Mason, Gary)
June 24, 2016 Filing 186 FIRST AMENDED CONSOLIDATED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc. , filed by Jane Doe.(Driscoll, John) re: #180 Modified text on 6/27/2016 (KKS).
June 24, 2016 Filing 185 TRANSCRIPT of #175 (STATUS CONFERENCE) held on 6/3/16 before Judge Ross. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Paczkowski, Lisa_Paczkowski@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7985. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 7/15/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/25/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/22/2016. (JAB)
June 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER re 4:16CV174: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no further action shall be taken in this case. The Clerk of Court is directed not to proceed with any action in this case, including the issuance of alias summonses, until further order of the Court. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/23/16. (JAB)
June 22, 2016 Filing 183 MEMORANDUM re #182 Joint Scheduling Plan by Defendant Noel Biderman and by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cassetta, Richard)
June 21, 2016 Filing 182 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. . (Cassetta, Richard)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER re #179 MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily filed by John Doe: SO ORDERED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/6/16. (JAB)
June 3, 2016 Filing 180 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc., Noel Biderman , filed by Gustavo Alfaro, Matthew Lisuzzo, Christopher Russell, Paul Jack, Nhung Truong, James Mike Shows, David Yagel, Brian Farr, steven coward, Anthony Imbarrato, Marvin Cabiness, John Hiles, III, Marc Benefield, Byron Goetting, Todd Witengier, Keith Macomber, David Miller, Britt Garrett.(Driscoll, John)
June 3, 2016 Filing 179 MOTION to Dismiss Case Voluntarily by Plaintiff John Doe. (Gordon, Richard)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 178 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE : #177 SO ORDERED, Plaintiff John Doe, by and through his attorneys (Joseph J. Siprut), hereby dismisses this action without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(a)(l)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules Of Civil Procedure.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/3/16. (KKS)
June 3, 2016 Filing 177 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Doe(Individually and on Behalf of all others similiary situated) (Siprut, Joseph)
June 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 176 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet, confer and submit a joint proposed scheduling plan with deadlines for limited discovery and the filing and briefing of the motion to stay and compel arbitration by Tuesday, June 21, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the July 1, 2016 status conference is rescheduled for Friday, July 8, 2016 at 10:00 a.m.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/3/16. (KKS)
June 3, 2016 Filing 175 Minute Entry for Status Conference proceedings held before District Judge John A. Ross on 6/3/2016; Parties present for status conference. Various deadlines discussed. The deadline for filing the Joint Scheduling Plan for the first phase of discovery is June 21, 2016. Next status conference is set for July 8, 2016 @ 10:00 a.m. ( Response to Court due by 6/21/2016., Status Conference set for 7/8/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross.). (Court Reporter: Lisa Paczkowski.) (FTR Gold: No.) (Proceedings: 10:11-10:26) (Attachments: #1 Attorney List) (KKS)
June 3, 2016 Filing 174 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone at June 3, 2016 Status Conference: by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe #1 (Hammond, Julian)
June 3, 2016 Filing 173 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone: by Plaintiff Grant Deloach (Lynch, Gary)
June 2, 2016 Filing 172 NOTICE Intent to Appear By Telephone at the June 3, 2016 Hearing: by Plaintiff Gustavo Alfaro (Garrison, William)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER: All counsel who have notified the Court of their intent to appear by telephone at the June 3, 2016 status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810-9415 from the United States (for callers outside the United States the caller paid international number is 636-651- 3185). The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/2/16. (KKS)
June 2, 2016 Filing 170 ENTRY of Appearance by Sharon A. Harris for Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo. (Harris, Sharon)
May 31, 2016 Filing 169 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone at the June 3, 2016 Status Conference: by Defendant Noel Biderman (Dumain, Ian)
May 31, 2016 Filing 168 CONSENT to Joint Proposed Agenda for June 3, 2016 Status Conference by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc... (Cassetta, Richard)
May 26, 2016 Filing 167 NOTICE of Intent to Appear by Telephone at the June 3, 2016 Status Conference: by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe re #157 Scheduling Order, (Hinton, Christopher)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 166 Docket Text ORDER Re: #164 MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Robin Fipps ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/26/2016. (KMS)
May 26, 2016 Filing 165 NOTICE Intent to Appear By Telephone at the June 3, 2016 Status Conference: by Plaintiffs SZILVIA BERKI, CHRIS HRIVNAK re #157 Scheduling Order, (Duffy, Jennifer)
May 25, 2016 Filing 164 MOTION for Extension of: Deadline to Serve Defendants by Plaintiff Robin Fipps. (Harwell, Michael)
May 23, 2016 Filing 163 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone at the June 3, 2016 Status Conference: by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo (Zimmerman, Thomas)
May 23, 2016 Filing 162 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone: by Plaintiffs J. Doe 1, J. Doe 2, J. Doe 3, J. Doe 4, J. Doe 5 re #157 Scheduling Order, (Marcussen, Carin)
May 23, 2016 Filing 161 NOTICE Intent to Appeal Telephonically: by Plaintiff Christopher Russell (Mason, Gary)
May 23, 2016 Filing 160 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone at the June 3, 2016 Status Conference: by Plaintiff Robin Fipps (Harwell, Michael)
May 23, 2016 Filing 159 NOTICE of Intent to Appear by Telephone at the June 3, 2016 Status Conference: by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe #1 (Hammond, Julian)
May 4, 2016 Filing 158 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by Gary E. Mason (Mason, Gary) (Address updated on 5/4/2016 KXS).
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED by agreement of all counsel that the May 6, 2016 status conference is CANCELLED. The next regular status conference with counsel is set for Friday, June 3, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/3/2016. (KMS)
May 3, 2016 Filing 156 NOTICE Intent to appear by telephone: by Plaintiffs SZILVIA BERKI, CHRIS HRIVNAK at May 6, 2016 status conference (Duffy, Jennifer)
May 2, 2016 Filing 155 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone at the May 6, 2016 Status Conference: by Defendant Noel Biderman (Green, Christopher)
May 2, 2016 Filing 154 NOTICE Joint Statement Regarding Agenda for May 6, 2016 Status Conference: by Plaintiff Jane Doe (Driscoll, John)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Avid Dating Life Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order Precluding Use of Stolen Document by Plaintiffs or their Counsel [ #115 ] is GRANTED in part. Plaintiffs and their counsel are hereby precluded from using or referring to the stolen documents in the consolidated class action complaint. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/29/16. (JAB)
April 26, 2016 Filing 152 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone at the May 6, 2016 Status Conference: by Plaintiff Robin Fipps re #148 MOTION for Leave to Participate in May 6, 2016 Status Conference by Telephone (Harwell, Michael)
April 26, 2016 Filing 151 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe #1 of Intent to Appear by Telephone at the May 6, 2016 Status Conference (Hammond, Julian)
April 26, 2016 Filing 150 NOTICE Intent to Appear Telephonically: by Plaintiff Christopher Russell (Mason, Gary)
April 26, 2016 Filing 149 NOTICE by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo of Intent to Appear by Telephone (Rudnick, Jordan)
April 26, 2016 Filing 148 MOTION for leave to participate in May 6, 2016 Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiff Robin Fipps. (Harwell, Michael) Modified on 4/27/2016-terminated motion-attorney refiled as notice (doc # 152)(JAB).
April 25, 2016 Filing 147 NOTICE Intent to Appear by Telephone: by Plaintiffs J. Doe 1, J. Doe 2, J. Doe 3, J. Doe 4, J. Doe 5 (Marcussen, Carin)
April 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER re #123 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lee E. Campbell Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/18/16. (JAB)
April 18, 2016 Filing 145 AMICUS BRIEF re #141 Amicus Brief Response to Plaintiff's Response to Amicus Brief by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER re #143 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Doe #. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/14/16. (JAB)
April 14, 2016 Filing 143 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Doe # (Linam, Stephanie)
April 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Plaintiffs to file their consolidated class action complaint is extended for a period of 45 days, from April 19, 2016 up to and including June 3, 2016. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/13/16. (JAB)
April 12, 2016 Filing 141 RESPONSE to #136 Amicus Brief, by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Driscoll, John) Modified text on 4/13/2016 (JAB).
April 12, 2016 Filing 140 MOTION for Extension of Time to File ;Extension to file the following: Consolidated Class Action Complaint ;Proposed extension date 45 days after the Court issues its ruling on Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.s Motion for Protective Order Precluding Use of Stolen Documents by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Memorandum in Support)(Driscoll, John) Modified attachement text on 4/13/2016 (JAB).
April 6, 2016 Filing 139 NOTICE Response to Notice of Supplemental Authority Related to its Motion for a Protective Order Precluding Use of Stolen Documents by Plaintiffs or Their Counsel: by Plaintiff Jane Doe re #137 Notice (Other) (Driscoll, John)
April 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 138 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : #91 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Proceed under Pseudonyms #91 is DENIED in part in accordance with the rulings herein.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/6/16. (KKS)
April 5, 2016 Filing 137 NOTICE Supplemental Authority: by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc. re #115 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Use of Stolen Documents By Plaintiffs or Their Counsel (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Cassetta, Richard)
April 4, 2016 Filing 136 AMICUS BRIEF re #115 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Use of Stolen Documents By Plaintiffs or Their Counsel by Movants Amicus Doe 1, Amicus Doe 2, Amicus Doe 3. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger, #2 Exhibits A-J)(KKS)
April 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #133 MOTION to File Amicus Brief re. Defendant Avid Dating Life Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order by Movants Amicus Doe 1, Amicus Doe 2, Amicus Doe 3. (Kronenberger, Karl). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/4/16. (KKS)
March 25, 2016 Filing 134 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #133 MOTION to File Amicus Brief re. Defendant Avid Dating Life Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order filed by Movants Amicus Doe 1, Amicus Doe 2, Amicus Doe 3. (Attachments: #1 Amicus Brief, #2 Declaration of Karl S. Kronenberger, #3 Exhibit A - J)(Kronenberger, Karl)
March 25, 2016 Filing 133 MOTION to File Amicus Brief re. Defendant Avid Dating Life Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order by Movants Amicus Doe 1, Amicus Doe 2, Amicus Doe 3. (Kronenberger, Karl)
March 25, 2016 Filing 132 ENTRY of Appearance by Karl S. Kronenberger for Movants Amicus Doe 1, Amicus Doe 2, Amicus Doe 3. (Kronenberger, Karl)
March 25, 2016 Filing 131 REPLY to Response to Motion re #115 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Use of Stolen Documents By Plaintiffs or Their Counsel filed by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Cassetta, Richard)
March 15, 2016 Filing 130 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #115 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Use of Stolen Documents By Plaintiffs or Their Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Driscoll, John)
March 15, 2016 Filing 129 ENTRY of Appearance by Carin L. Marcussen for Plaintiffs J. Doe 1, J. Doe 2, J. Doe 3, J. Doe 4, J. Doe 5. (Marcussen, Carin)
March 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 128 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Their Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.s Motion for a Protective Order Under Seal [ #125 ] is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their response to Avids motion for protective order on the threshold issue of whether Plaintiffs can use, either directly or indirectly, documents and information that were illegally obtained from Avid. Plaintiffs shall not reference or quote from those documents in their response nor attach thereto any exhibits that refer to or quote from those documents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that in light of the Courts ruling, the time for filing Plaintiffs response to Avids motion for protective order is extended to Tuesday, March 15, 2016. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.s Motion for a Protective Order in Excess of Page Limitations [ #124 ] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/11/16. (JAB)
March 10, 2016 Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #125 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Driscoll, John)
March 9, 2016 Filing 126 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #125 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document filed by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
March 8, 2016 Filing 125 MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Document by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Driscoll, John)
March 8, 2016 Filing 124 Consent MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Driscoll, John)
March 4, 2016 Filing 123 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lee E. Campbell Without Prejudice (Bates, Joseph)
March 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER: Following a status conference with counsel, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by agreement of all counsel, the deadline for Plaintiffs to file a consolidated class action complaint is extended from March 22, 2016 to April 19, 2016. Following the filing of the consolidated complaint, the Court will issue an order directing the parties to submit a joint proposed scheduling plan for limited discovery related to Defendants contemplated motion to stay and compel arbitration and the briefing of said motion. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the April 8, 2016 status conference is reset for Friday, May 6, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/4/16. (JAB)
March 4, 2016 Filing 121 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge John A. Ross: Status Conference held on 3/4/2016. Next status conference is continued to 5/16/16 @ 10:00AM. Order to follow. (Court Reporter:Lisa Paczkowski.) (FTR Gold: No.) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Attorney List) (JAB)
March 3, 2016 Filing 120 NOTICE Intent to Participate by Telephone: by Defendants Barnes & Thornburg LLP, Leslie Weiss (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Docket Text ORDER Re: #118 MOTION for Leave to Attend Status Conference Telephonically by Plaintiff John Doe #; ORDERED GRANTED; Counsel participating in the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810-9415. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/3/2016. (KMS)
March 2, 2016 Filing 118 MOTION for Leave to Attend Status Conference Telephonically by Plaintiff John Doe #. (Linam, Stephanie)
March 1, 2016 Filing 117 REPLY to Response to Motion re #91 MOTION for Leave to PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Driscoll, John)
February 29, 2016 Filing 116 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #115 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Use of Stolen Documents By Plaintiffs or Their Counsel filed by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Cassetta, Richard)
February 29, 2016 Filing 115 MOTION for Protective Order Precluding Use of Stolen Documents By Plaintiffs or Their Counsel by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
February 29, 2016 Filing 114 NOTICE Joint Proposed Agenda: by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc. (Cassetta, Richard)
February 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 113 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #112 MOTION for Leave to Participate in the March 4, 2016 Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiffs J. Doe 1, J. Doe 2, J. Doe 3, J. Doe 4, J. Doe 5., #111 MOTION for Leave to Appear to at Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiffs SZILVIA BERKI, CHRIS HRIVNAK. (Duffy, Jennifer) ORDERED GRANTED. Counsel participating in the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810-9415. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/29/16. (JAB)
February 29, 2016 Filing 112 MOTION for Leave to Participate in the March 4, 2016 Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiffs J. Doe 1, J. Doe 2, J. Doe 3, J. Doe 4, J. Doe 5. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Federman, William)
February 27, 2016 Filing 111 MOTION for Leave to Appear to at Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiffs SZILVIA BERKI, CHRIS HRIVNAK. (Duffy, Jennifer)
February 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Docket Text ORDER Re: #108 MOTION for Leave to Participate in the March 4, 2016 Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiff John Doe. (Yates, John); ORDERED GRANTED: Counsel participating in the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810-9415. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/26/2016. (KMS)
February 25, 2016 Filing 109 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #91 MOTION for Leave to PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS filed by Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Cassetta, Richard)
February 25, 2016 Filing 108 MOTION for Leave to Participate in the March 4, 2016 Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiff John Doe. (Yates, John)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 107 Docket Text ORDER Re: #104 MOTION for Leave to Participate in the March 4, 2016, Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiff Robin Fipps; ORDERED GRANTED: Counsel participating in the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810-9415. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/25/2016. (KMS)
February 25, 2016 Filing 106 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Robin Fipps. (Harwell, Michael)
February 25, 2016 Filing 105 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Robin Fipps. (Harwell, Michael)
February 23, 2016 Filing 104 MOTION for Leave to Participate in the March 4, 2016, Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiff Robin Fipps. (Harwell, Michael)
February 23, 2016 Filing 103 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael Scott Harwell for Plaintiff Robin Fipps. (Harwell, Michael)
February 22, 2016 Filing 102 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by John Does 1-21. (Fry, Allison)
February 22, 2016 Filing 101 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by John Does 1-21. (Fry, Allison)
February 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #98 MOTION for Leave to Participate Telephonically at Status Conference by Plaintiff Christopher Russell. (Mason, Gary) ; GRANTING #99 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at the March 4, 2016 Status Conference by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe #1, John Doe #2. (Hammond, Julian) GRANTING #97 MOTION for Leave to Participate in March 4, 2016, Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo. (Rudnick, Jordan) ; Counsel participating in the status conference are directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810-9415. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/19/16. (KKS)
February 19, 2016 Filing 99 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at the March 4, 2016 Status Conference by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe #1, John Doe #2. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hammond, Julian)
February 18, 2016 Filing 98 MOTION for Leave to Participate Telephonically at Status Conference by Plaintiff Christopher Russell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Gary)
February 18, 2016 Filing 97 MOTION for Leave to Participate in March 4, 2016, Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo. (Rudnick, Jordan)
February 18, 2016 Filing 96 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher M. Green for Defendant Noel Biderman. (Green, Christopher)
February 17, 2016 Filing 95 ENTRY of Appearance by Ian M. Dumain for Defendant Noel Biderman. (Dumain, Ian)
February 17, 2016 Filing 94 ENTRY of Appearance by Wiilliam S. Ohlemeyer for Defendant Noel Biderman. (Ohlemeyer, Wiilliam)
February 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 93 PROTECTIVE ORDER : Granting #90 Consent MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/16/16. (KKS)
February 15, 2016 Filing 92 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #91 MOTION for Leave to PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - NYT Article, #2 Exhibit 2 - Huffington Post Article, #3 Exhibit 3 - Miami Herald Article, #4 Exhibit 4 - CNN Money Article, #5 Exhibit 5 - Email to John Doe (redacted), #6 Exhibit 6 - Wired Article, #7 Exhibit 7 - Daily Mail Article)(Quinn, Christopher)
February 15, 2016 Filing 91 MOTION for Leave to PROCEED UNDER PSEUDONYMS by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Quinn, Christopher)
February 12, 2016 Filing 90 Consent MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Limited Protective Order)(Driscoll, John)
February 10, 2016 Filing 89 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: Ashley Madison Customer Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 2669; Fipps v. Avid Life Media Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 2:1600152, opened as EDMO case No. 4:16CV00174 JAR. (DJO)
February 10, 2016 Filing 88 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: Ashley Madison Customer Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 2669: Fipps v. Avid Life Media Inc et al, N.D. Alabama, Case No. 2:1600152. (DJO)
February 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER APPOINTING LEADERSHIP COUNSEL (see order for details) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/5/2016. (KMS)
February 5, 2016 Filing 86 RESPONSE to Motion re #82 MOTION to Supplement #75 Order,,,,, #65 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS INTERIM LIAISON COUNSEL, INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND INTERIM EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE names:Douglas P. Dowd, John J. Dris filed by Plaintiffs David Poyet, Christopher Russell. (Flannery, Michael)
February 4, 2016 Filing 85 RESPONSE in Opposition re: #84 Siprut's Renewed Motion for Appointment of Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel and re: #80 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel names:Gary E. Mason as interim co-lead counsel and Michael Braunstein, Michael J. Flannery, and Robert K. Shelquist as members of the plaintiffs' executive committee filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Dowd, Douglas) Modified text on 2/5/2016 (KKS).
February 1, 2016 Filing 84 RESPONSE to Motion re #65 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS INTERIM LIAISON COUNSEL, INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND INTERIM EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE names:Douglas P. Dowd, John J. Driscoll, W. Lewis Garrison, Jr., #13 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS INTERIM LIAISON COUNSEL, INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND INTERIM EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE names:Douglas P. Dowd, John J. Driscoll, W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. Siprut's Renewed Motion For Appointment Of Co-Lead Interim Class Counsel (And Response To Driscoll Motion For Appointment) filed by Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, Michael Pauly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Siprut's Response To Motion For Appointment Of Plaintiffs' Interim Counsel (Dkt. No. 43))(Siprut, Joseph)
February 1, 2016 Filing 83 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #65 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS INTERIM LIAISON COUNSEL, INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND INTERIM EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE names:Douglas P. Dowd, John J. Driscoll, W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Zimmerman, #2 Exhibit 2 - Hammond, #3 Proposed Order)(Dowd, Douglas)
February 1, 2016 Filing 82 MOTION to Supplement #75 Order,,,,, #65 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS INTERIM LIAISON COUNSEL, INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND INTERIM EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE names:Douglas P. Dowd, John J. Driscoll, W. Lewis Garrison, Jr., #66 Memorandum in Support of Motion,,, by Plaintiffs J. Doe 1, J. Doe 2, J. Doe 3, J. Doe 4, J. Doe 5. (Federman, William)
February 1, 2016 Filing 81 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #80 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel names:Gary E. Mason as interim co-lead counsel and Michael Braunstein, Michael J. Flannery, and Robert K. Shelquist as members of the plaintiffs' executive committee filed by Plaintiffs David Poyet, Christopher Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Flannery, Michael)
February 1, 2016 Filing 80 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel names:Gary E. Mason as interim co-lead counsel and Michael Braunstein, Michael J. Flannery, and Robert K. Shelquist as members of the plaintiffs' executive committee by Plaintiffs David Poyet, Christopher Russell. (Flannery, Michael)
February 1, 2016 Filing 79 ENTRY of Appearance by Yahonnes S. Cleary for Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cleary, Yahonnes)
January 29, 2016 Filing 78 TRANSCRIPT of #74 (INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE) held on January 26, 2016 before Judge JOHN A. ROSS. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Paczkowski, Lisa_Paczkowski@moed.uscourts.gov, 314-244-7985. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/19/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/29/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2016. (KKS)
January 28, 2016 Filing 77 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Suggestions for Appointment of Defendants' Liaison Counsel by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER : For purposes of further clarification of the Court's Order of January 27, 2016 (Doc. No. #75 ), should Defendants file a motion in response to Plaintiffs' consolidated class action complaint, Plaintiffs shall have thirty (30) days to file their response to the motion and Defendants shall have fifteen (15) days for reply.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/28/16. (KKS)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 75. Mailed to party not notified electronically. Thu Jan 28 06:37:36 CST 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
January 28, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 76. Mailed to party not notified electronically. Thu Jan 28 11:46:53 CST 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER: Any further requests for appointment of Plaintiffs' liaison counsel, lead counsel or executive committee shall be filed no later than Monday, February 1, 2016. All pending motions in the related cases are denied without prejudice. Any Motion for Leave to Proceed Under Pseudonyms shall be filed no later than Monday, February 15, 2016. If necessary, the parties shall file an agreed upon limited protective order concerning the disclosure of the identities of the Doe plaintiffs no later than Monday, February 15, 2016. Deadline for Plaintiffs to file a consolidated class action complaint is Tuesday, March 22, 2016. Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Under Seal #48 DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal #49 is DENIED without prejudice. Status conferences with counsel scheduled for Friday, March 4, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. and April 8, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. (See Order for details.) ( In Court Hearing set for 4/8/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross., Response to Court due by 2/1/2016., Status Conference set for 3/4/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/27/16. Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR et al.(KKS) Modified text on 1/27/2016 (KKS). Modified text at the request of chambers on 1/28/2016 (KKS).
January 26, 2016 Filing 74 Minute Entry for Initial Status Conference proceedings held before District Judge John A. Ross on 1/26/2016. Order to follow. (Court Reporter:Lisa Paczkowski.) (FTR Gold: No.)(Proceedings: 1:31pm - 2:46pm) (Attachments: #1 Attorney List) (KKS)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorneys Kevin D. Rising, David W. Nelson, Thomas G. Haskins, Jr., Christine E.Skoczylas and the law firm of Barnes & Thornburg, LLP, by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc..,. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/26/16. (KKS)
January 26, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE Appearance of Counsel: by Plaintiff Lee E. Campbell Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR et al.(Bates, Joseph)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 71 Docket Text ORDER: GRANTING #68 MOTION for Leave to Attend Status Conference Telephonically by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe. (Hinton, Christopher). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/26/16. (KKS)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 71. Mailed to party not notified electronically. Tue Jan 26 08:42:20 CST 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
January 26, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 73. Mailed to party not notified electronically. Tue Jan 26 11:50:04 CST 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
January 25, 2016 Filing 70 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #58 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MICHAEL J. FLANNERY AS LIAISON COUNSEL FOR THE FRAUD GROUP filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Dowd, Douglas)
January 25, 2016 Filing 69 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney ;attorney/firm Barnes & Thornburg LLP by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Nelson, David)
January 25, 2016 Filing 68 MOTION for Leave to Attend Status Conference Telephonically by Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hinton, Christopher)
January 25, 2016 Filing 67 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher S. Hinton for Plaintiffs Jane Doe, John Doe. (Hinton, Christopher)
January 22, 2016 Filing 66 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #65 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS INTERIM LIAISON COUNSEL, INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND INTERIM EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE names:Douglas P. Dowd, John J. Driscoll, W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. filed by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Dowd & Dowd, P.C., #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - The Driscoll Firm, P.C., #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 - Heninger Davis Garrison LLC, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 - W. Lewis Garrison, Jr., #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5 - John Arthur Eaves, Jr., #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6 - The Rosen Law Firm P.A., #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7 - Carlson Lynch, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8 - Badley & Mauro, LLC, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 9 - FEDERMAN SHERWOOD)(Driscoll, John)
January 22, 2016 Filing 65 Amended MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS INTERIM LIAISON COUNSEL, INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND INTERIM EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE names:Douglas P. Dowd, John J. Driscoll, W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Driscoll, John)
January 22, 2016 Filing 64 MEMORANDUM Proposed Agenda For January 26, 2016 Initial Status Conference by Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, Michael Pauly. (Siprut, Joseph)
January 22, 2016 Filing 63 ENTRY of Appearance by John S. Marrese for Plaintiffs John Doe, Michael Pauly. (Marrese, John)
January 22, 2016 Filing 62 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel Interim Co-Lead Counsel names: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr. by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43)Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR et al.(Rudnick, Jordan)
January 22, 2016 Filing 61 MEMORANDUM JOINT MEMORANDUM TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AGENDA ITEMS by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Dowd, Douglas)
January 22, 2016 Filing 60 MEMORANDUM REGARDING PROPOSED INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE AGENDA ITEMS by Plaintiff Christopher Russell. Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR et al.(Flannery, Michael)
January 22, 2016 Filing 59 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re (15 in 4:15-cv-01930-JAR, 8 in 4:15-cv-01922-JAR, 27 in 4:15-cv-01929-JAR, 17 in 4:15-cv-01928-JAR, 6 in 4:15-cv-01876-JAR, 7 in 4:15-cv-01920-JAR, 15 in 4:15-cv-01927-JAR, 15 in 4:15-cv-01921-JAR, 30 in 4:15-cv-01132-JAR, 9 in 4:15-cv-01943-JAR, 9 in 4:15-cv-01925-JAR, 16 in 4:15-cv-01923-JAR, 22 in 4:15-cv-01879-JAR, 29 in 4:15-cv-01878-JAR, 13 in 4:15-cv-01877-JAR, 10 in 4:15-cv-01945-JAR, 58 in 4:15-md-02669-JAR, 16 in 4:15-cv-01944-JAR, 12 in 4:15-cv-01924-JAR, 4 in 4:15-cv-01926-JAR, 20 in 4:15-cv-01914-JAR) MOTION to Appoint Counsel MICHAEL J. FLANNERY AS LIAISON COUNSEL FOR THE FRAUD GROUP filed by Plaintiff Christopher Russell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, WBM Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit B, CGL Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit C, BLF Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit D, LGN Firm Resume)Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR et al.(Flannery, Michael)
January 22, 2016 Filing 58 MOTION to Appoint Counsel MICHAEL J. FLANNERY AS LIAISON COUNSEL FOR THE FRAUD GROUP by Plaintiff Christopher Russell. Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR et al.(Flannery, Michael)
January 22, 2016 Filing 57 ENTRY of Appearance by Helen Claire Looney for Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Looney, Helen)
January 22, 2016 Filing 56 ENTRY of Appearance by Richard P. Cassetta for Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
January 22, 2016 Filing 55 ENTRY of Appearance by Lorin L. Reisner for Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Reisner, Lorin)
January 22, 2016 Filing 54 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel J. Kramer for Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Kramer, Daniel)
January 22, 2016 Filing 53 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert A. Atkins for Defendant Avid Dating Life, Inc.. (Atkins, Robert)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 52 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #51 MOTION for Leave to Participate in the Initial Status Conference Via Telephone by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, John Doe. ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/22/16. (JAB)
January 22, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 52. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Fri Jan 22 09:15:11 CST 2016 (Bernsen, John)
January 21, 2016 Filing 51 MOTION for Leave to Participate in the Initial Status Conference Via Telephone by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, John Doe. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bartlett, Taylor)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 50 Docket Text ORDER Re: #47 MOTION for Leave to Participate in the January 26, 2016 Initial Status Conference by Telephone and Permission to Substitute Counsel for Appearance at Hearing by Plaintiff David Poyet ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/21/2016. (KMS)
January 21, 2016 Filing 49 Second MOTION for Leave to File Sealed Motion by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo. (Rudnick, Jordan)
January 21, 2016 Filing 48 First MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo. (Rudnick, Jordan)
January 21, 2016 Filing 47 MOTION for Leave to Participate in the January 26, 2016 Initial Status Conference by Telephone and Permission to Substitute Counsel for Appearance at Hearing by Plaintiff David Poyet. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shelquist, Robert)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Docket Text Order: GRANTING #44 MOTION for Leave to Participate in the Jan. 26, 2016 Initial Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiffs SZILVIA BERKI, CHRIS HRIVNAK.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/21/16. (KKS)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 50. sent to parties not set up for electronic notification Thu Jan 21 14:00:48 CST 2016 (Scheele, Kara)
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 46. sent to parties not set up for electronic notification Thu Jan 21 14:02:03 CST 2016 (Scheele, Kara)
January 20, 2016 Filing 45 NOTICE Appearance: by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, John Doe (Garrison, William)
January 20, 2016 Filing 44 MOTION for Leave to Participate in the Jan. 26, 2016 Initial Status Conference by Telephone by Plaintiffs SZILVIA BERKI, CHRIS HRIVNAK. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Duffy, Jennifer)
January 20, 2016 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re #13 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS INTERIM LIAISON COUNSEL, INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND INTERIM EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE names:Douglas P. Dowd, John J. Driscoll, W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. Siprut Response to Motion for Appointment of Plaintiffs' Interim Counsel filed by Plaintiffs John Doe, John Doe, Michael Pauly. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Siprut, Joseph)
January 20, 2016 Filing 42 NOTICE by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, John Doe (Hood, Christopher)
January 20, 2016 Filing 41 NOTICE Appearance: by Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, John Doe (Bartlett, Taylor)
January 20, 2016 Filing 40 NOTICE Appearance of Counsel: by Plaintiffs SZILVIA BERKI, CHRIS HRIVNAK (Duffy, Jennifer)
January 20, 2016 Filing 39 ENTRY of Appearance by Kyle Alan Shamberg for Plaintiffs John Doe, Michael Pauly. (Shamberg, Kyle)
January 20, 2016 Filing 38 ENTRY of Appearance by James F. McDonough, III for Plaintiffs Gustavo Alfaro, John Doe. (McDonough, James)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Docket Text ORDER Re: #32 MOTION to Withdraw #29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel J. Kramer and #33 MOTION to Withdraw #30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lorin L. Reisner ; ORDERED GRANTED. (cc: finance) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/20/2016. (KMS)
January 20, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 37. sent to parties not set up for electronic notification Wed Jan 20 11:48:17 CST 2016 (Scheele, Kara)
January 19, 2016 Filing 36 ENTRY of Appearance by Lorin L. Reisner for Defendant Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Reisner, Lorin)
January 19, 2016 Filing 35 ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel J. Kramer for Defendant Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Kramer, Daniel)
January 19, 2016 Filing 34 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert A. Atkins for Defendant Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Atkins, Robert)
January 19, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION to Withdraw #30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lorin L. Reisner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5221301) by Defendant Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Reisner, Lorin)
January 19, 2016 Filing 32 MOTION to Withdraw #29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel J. Kramer. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5221291) by Defendant Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Kramer, Daniel)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice [ #26 ] is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/19/16. (JAB)
January 19, 2016 Filing 30 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Lorin L. Reisner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5221301) by Defendant Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Reisner, Lorin)
January 19, 2016 Filing 29 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Daniel J. Kramer. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5221291) by Defendant Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kramer, Daniel)
January 19, 2016 Filing 28 ENTRY of Appearance by Philip Sholtz for Plaintiff Jane Doe. Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR, 4:15-cv-01132-JAR(Sholtz, Philip)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 31. Mailed to party not set up for electronic notification Tue Jan 19 12:20:27 CST 2016 (Bernsen, John)
January 18, 2016 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew D. Kinghorn for Plaintiff Jane Doe. Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR, 4:15-cv-01132-JAR(Kinghorn, Andrew)
January 15, 2016 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Robert A. Atkins. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number 0865-5219347) by Defendant Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Atkins, Robert)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Docket Text ORDER Re: #21 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at the Initial Status Conference by Plaintiff J. Doe 1. and #24 MOTION for Leave to PARTICIPATE IN THE JANUARY 26, 2016 INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo ; ORDERED GRANTED. Counsel is directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810- 9415. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/12/2016. (KMS)
January 12, 2016 Filing 24 MOTION for Leave to PARTICIPATE IN THE JANUARY 26, 2016 INITIAL STATUS CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE by Plaintiff Matthew Lisuzzo. (Rudnick, Jordan)
January 12, 2016 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Thomas Gerald Haskins, Jr for Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Haskins, Thomas)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Leave of Court to Attend Status Conference Telephonically filed by counsel for Plaintiff John Doe #20 is GRANTED. Counsel is directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810- 9415. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/12/2016. (KMS)
January 12, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone at the Initial Status Conference by Plaintiff J. Doe 1. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion For Leave of Court to Attend Status Conference Telephonically)(Hammond, Julian)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 22. sent to parties not set up for electronic notification Tue Jan 12 13:08:58 CST 2016 (Scheele, Kara)
January 12, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 25. sent to parties not set up for electronic notification Tue Jan 12 16:25:26 CST 2016 (Scheele, Kara)
January 11, 2016 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Attend Status Conference Telephonically by Plaintiff John Doe #. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Motion For Leave of Court to Attend Status Conference Telephonically)(Linam, Stephanie)
January 8, 2016 Filing 19 ENTRY of Appearance by Heidi D. Vollet for Defendants Barnes & Thornburg LLP, Leslie Weiss. (Vollet, Heidi)
January 8, 2016 Filing 18 ENTRY of Appearance by Timothy W. Van Ronzelen for Defendants Barnes & Thornburg LLP, Leslie Weiss. (Van Ronzelen, Timothy)
January 8, 2016 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Dale C. Doerhoff for Defendants Barnes & Thornburg LLP, Leslie Weiss. (Doerhoff, Dale)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Leave of Court to Attend Status Conference Telephonically filed by counsel for Plaintiff Christopher Russell #14 is GRANTED. Counsel is directed to call the conference toll free at 1-877-810-9415. The access code to enter the telephone conference for all participants is: 7519116. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/8/16. (KKS)
January 8, 2016 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert K. Shelquist for Plaintiff David Poyet. Associated Cases: 4:15-md-02669-JAR, 4:15-cv-01929-JAR(Shelquist, Robert)
January 8, 2016 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 16. Mailed to parties not notified electronically. Fri Jan 8 12:32:58 CST 2016 (Stamm, Katie)
January 7, 2016 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Attend Status Conference Telephonically by Plaintiff Christopher Russell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mason, Gary)
January 6, 2016 Filing 13 MOTION to Appoint Lead Counsel MOTION FOR APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS INTERIM LIAISON COUNSEL, INTERIM CO-LEAD COUNSEL, AND INTERIM EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE names:Douglas P. Dowd, John J. Driscoll, W. Lewis Garrison, Jr. by Plaintiff Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit 1 - Dowd & Dowd, P.C., #3 Exhibit 2 - The Driscoll Firm, P.C., #4 Exhibit 3 - Heninger Davis Garrison LLC, #5 Exhibit 4 - W. Lewis Garrison, Jr., #6 Exhibit 5 - John Arthur Eaves, Jr., #7 Exhibit 6 - The Rosen Law Firm P.A., #8 Exhibit 7 - Carlson Lynch, #9 Exhibit 8 - Badley & Mauro, LLC)(Dowd, Douglas)
January 4, 2016 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Michael J. Flannery for Plaintiff Christopher Russell. (Flannery, Michael)
December 30, 2015 Filing 11 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: Ashley Madison Customer Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 2669: Lee E. Campbell v. Avid Life Media Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1509475, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15-cv-01944-JAR,Lisuzzo v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1511305, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15-cv-01945-JAR. (DLB)
December 29, 2015 Filing 10 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: Ashley Madison Customer Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 2669: Lee E. Campbell v. Avid Life Media Inc et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1509475, Lisuzzo v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1511305. (DLB)
December 29, 2015 Filing 9 TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel Jeffery N. Luthi. In re: Ashley Madison Customer Data Security Breach Litigation MDL No. 2669: Doe v. Avid Life Media Inc et al, E.D. Arkansas, Case No. 4:1500640, opened as EDMO Case: 4:15-cv-01914-JAR,John Does et al v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1506619 4:1500640, opened as EDMO Case: 4:15-cv-01927-JAR, Szilvia Berki et al v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1508208 4:1500640, opened as EDMO Case: 4:15-cv-01928-JAR, David Poyet v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1508456 4:1500640, opened as EDMO Case: 4:15-cv-01929-JAR, Gustavo Alfaro v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 5:1502295 4:1500640, opened as EDMO Case: 4:15-cv-01930-JAR, Deloach v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, S.D. Georgia, Case No. 4:1500299 4:1500640, opened as EDMO Case: 4:15-cv-01925-JAR, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1507760 4:1500640, opened as EDMO Case: 4:15-cv-01921-JAR, Doe v. Avid Life Media et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1508270 4:1500640, opened as EDMO Case: 4:15-cv-01922-JAR, Pauly v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1508842 4:1500640, opened as EDMO Case: 4:15-cv-01924-JAR, Russell v. Avid Life Media Inc. et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 8:1502693 4:1500640, opened as EDMO Case: 4:15-cv-01923-JAR, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2:1500386 4:1500640, opened as EDMO Case: 4:15-cv-01926-JAR, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, S.D. Mississippi, Case No. 3:1500658 4:1500640, opened as EDMO Case: 4:15 -cv-01920-JAR, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1507017 , opened as EDMO Case: 4:15-cv-01943-JAR.(DLB).
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Stay December 14, 2015 Order Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint using Real Name by December 23, 2015 [ #7 ] is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/28/15. (JAB)
December 28, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 8. Mailed to parties not set up for electronic notification Mon Dec 28 12:36:32 CST 2015 (Bernsen, John)
December 23, 2015 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Stay December 14, 2015 Order Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint Using Real Name By December 23, 2015 by Plaintiff John Doe #. (Linam, Stephanie)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay Deadlines in Cases Transferred Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 and Cases that are Subsequently Transferred, and to Set an Initial Status Conference for January 2016 #3 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that an initial status conference is set in this matter on Tuesday, January 26, 2016 at 1:30 p.m. in Courtroom 12 N, United States District Court, 111 S. 10th Street, St. Louis, Missouri. All participating counsel may appear either in person or by telephone with leave of Court.The conference will encompass preliminary issues regarding setting a Case Management Order. Counsel may file written suggestions for items to be included on the agenda for this conference no later than January 22, 2016. ( Status Conference set for 1/26/2016 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12N before District Judge John A. Ross.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/23/15. (KKS)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 5 PRACTICE AND PROCEDURE ORDER UPON TRANSFER (SEE ORDER); 4. All documents shall be filed only in the main case number 4:15MD2669 JAR. Nothing shall be filed in any of the individual case files.... Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/23/15. (KKS)
December 23, 2015 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5,6. Mailed to party not notified electronically. Wed Dec 23 12:50:24 CST 2015 (Stamm, Katie)
December 22, 2015 Filing 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) regarding multidistrict litigation IN RE: ASHLEY MADISON CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION MDL No. 2669 by Clerk of the Panel; Doe v. Avid Life Media Inc et al, E.D. Arkansas, Case No. 4:1500640, John Does et al v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1506619, Szilvia Berki et al v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 2:1508208, David Poyet v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al. C.D. California, Case No. 2:1508456, Gustavo Alfaro v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, C.D. California, Case No. 5:1502295, Deloach v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, S.D. Georgia, Case No. 4:1500299, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1507760, Doe v. Avid Life Media et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1508270, Pauly v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, N.D. Illinois, Case No. 1:1508842, Russell v. Avid Life Media Inc. et al, D. Maryland, Case No. 8:1502693, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, S.D. Mississippi, Case No. 3:1500658, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, S.D. New York, Case No. 1:1507017, Doe v. Avid Life Media, Inc. et al, E.D. Virginia, Case No. 2:1500386. (DJO)
December 18, 2015 Filing 3 Consent MOTION to Stay Deadlines in Cases Transferred Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 And Cases That Are Subsequently Transferred, And to Set an Initial Status Conference for January 2016 by Defendants Avid Dating Life, Inc., Avid Life Media, Inc.. (Cassetta, Richard)
December 18, 2015 Filing 2 TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the PanelIN RE: ASHLEY MADISON CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION MDL No. 2669; DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., N.D. Texas, Case No. 3:15-02750, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV01876 JAR, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., N.D. Alabama, Case No. 6:15-01464, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV01877 JAR, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., C.D. California, Case No. 2:15-06405, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV01878 JAR, DOE 1, ET AL. v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., C.D. California, Case No. 8:15-01347, opened as EDMO Case No. 4:15CV01879 JAR. (DJO)
December 9, 2015 Filing 1 TRANSFER ORDER with Schedule A Attached regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Sarah S. Vance on 12/9/15. DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., Northern District of Alabama, C.A. No. 6:15-01464, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., Central District of California, C.A. No. 2:15-06405, DOE 1, ET AL. v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., ET AL., Central District of California, C.A. No. 8:15-01347, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., Eastern District of Missouri, C.A. No. 4:15-01132, DOE v. AVID LIFE MEDIA, INC., Northern District of Texas, C.A. No. 3:15-02750. (DLB)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IN RE: ASHLEY MADISON CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Does 1-21
Represented By: Allison P. Fry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Miller
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nhung Truong
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHRIS HRIVNAK
Represented By: Jennifer L. Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan N. Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Richard R Gordon
Represented By: Taylor C. Bartlett
Represented By: Christopher S. Hinton
Represented By: John S. Marrese
Represented By: Michael Loren Silverman
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison, Jr.
Represented By: James F. McDonough, III
Represented By: Katrina Carroll
Represented By: Christopher B. Hood
Represented By: John Parker Yates
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Thomas E Baddley, Jr
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Represented By: John T. Kirtley, III
Represented By: Jeffrey P Mauro
Represented By: Carlton F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe No. 2
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Doe 4
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Represented By: Carin L. Marcussen
Represented By: Byron T Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Macomber
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Poyet
Represented By: Kevin A. Seely
Represented By: Leonid Kandinov
Represented By: Rebecca A. Peterson
Represented By: Robert K. Shelquist
Represented By: Conrad B Stephens
Represented By: Ashley R. Rifkin
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Brian J. Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Pauly
Represented By: John S. Marrese
Represented By: Michael Loren Silverman
Represented By: Kyle Alan Shamberg
Represented By: Joseph J. Siprut
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee E. Campbell
Represented By: Joseph Henry Bates, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Hiles, III
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Doe 2
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Represented By: Carin L. Marcussen
Represented By: Byron T Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grant Deloach
Represented By: Thomas A. Withers
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: William G. Bell, III
Represented By: Anthony C. Lake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Witengier
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Doe 5
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Represented By: Carin L. Marcussen
Represented By: Byron T Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Benefield
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Doe 3
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Represented By: Carin L. Marcussen
Represented By: Byron T Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #3
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Represented By: Polina Pecherskaya
Represented By: Ari Cherniak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Yagel
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Coward
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Britt Garrett
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thadeaus G Scharf, III
Represented By: David Louis Gershner
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: Stephanie A. Linam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe No. 1
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marvin Cabiness
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Russell
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: Michael J. Flannery
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SZILVIA BERKI
Represented By: Jennifer L. Duffy
Represented By: Jonathan N. Shub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #2
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Represented By: Polina Pecherskaya
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ari Cherniak
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Represented By: Alex Lumaghi
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: William T. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Imbarrato
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Fipps
Represented By: M Scott Harwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Jack
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J. Doe 1
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Represented By: William Bernard Federman
Represented By: Carin L. Marcussen
Represented By: Byron T Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Goetting
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Farr
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Lisuzzo
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: Sharon A. Harris
Represented By: Jordan Mitchell Rudnick
Represented By: Scott Theodore Ferrill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ms. Jane Doe
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Christopher S. Hinton
Represented By: Ari Cherniak
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: Phillip C. Kim
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Represented By: Alex Lumaghi
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: William T. Dowd
Represented By: Andrew D. Kinghorn
Represented By: Philip Sholtz
Represented By: Tara K. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gustavo Alfaro
Represented By: Taylor C. Bartlett
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Steven W. Ritcheson
Represented By: William Lewis Garrison, Jr.
Represented By: James F. McDonough, III
Represented By: Christopher B. Hood
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mike Shows
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #1
Represented By: Julian Ari Hammond
Represented By: Polina Pecherskaya
Represented By: John J. Driscoll
Represented By: Ari Cherniak
Represented By: Douglas P. Dowd
Represented By: Christopher J. Quinn
Represented By: Alex Lumaghi
Represented By: Gregory J. Pals
Represented By: William T. Dowd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe #
Represented By: David Louis Gershner
Represented By: Charles D. Davidson
Represented By: Christopher D. Jennings
Represented By: Stephanie A. Linam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe 312017
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avid Dating Life, Inc.
Represented By: Richard P. Cassetta
Represented By: Helen Claire Looney
Represented By: Robert A. Atkins
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: James C Barton, Jr
Represented By: Yahonnes S. Cleary
Represented By: David William Nelson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Lorin L. Reisner
Represented By: Thomas Gerald Haskins, Jr
Represented By: Kevin D Rising
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noel Biderman
Represented By: Christopher M. Green
Represented By: Ian M. Dumain
Represented By: William S. Ohlemeyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barnes & Thornburg LLP
Represented By: Heidi D. Vollet
Represented By: Dale C. Doerhoff
Represented By: Timothy W. Van Ronzelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Avid Life Media, Inc.
Represented By: Richard P. Cassetta
Represented By: Helen Claire Looney
Represented By: Robert A. Atkins
Represented By: E. B. Chiles, IV
Represented By: James C Barton, Jr
Represented By: Yahonnes S. Cleary
Represented By: David William Nelson
Represented By: Daniel J. Kramer
Represented By: Christine Elizabeth Skoczylas
Represented By: Lorin L. Reisner
Represented By: Thomas Gerald Haskins, Jr
Represented By: Kevin D Rising
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Weiss
Represented By: Heidi D. Vollet
Represented By: Dale C. Doerhoff
Represented By: Timothy W. Van Ronzelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amicus Doe 1
Represented By: Karl S. Kronenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amicus Doe 3
Represented By: Karl S. Kronenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amicus Doe 2
Represented By: Karl S. Kronenberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shawn M O'Malley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?