Zell v. USA
Petitioner: Thomas Zell
Respondent: USA
Case Number: 4:2016cv00196
Filed: February 12, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Motions to Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2255
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's motion to vacate, set aside, or correct sentence under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 1 is DENIED, and his claims are DISMISSED with prejudice. A separate judgment of dismissal will accom pany this Memorandum and Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that because Petitioner cannot make a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, the Court will not issue a certificate of appealability. See Cox v. Norris, 133 F.3d 565, 569 (8th Cir. 1997), cert. denied, 525 U.S. 834 (1998). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 01/10/2017. (CLO)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Alternate Counsel 11 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner's Motion to Strike as Premature and Non-Responsive or in the Alternative, Motio n to Hold Above-Captioned Cause in Abeyance Until Supreme Court Decides Welch v. United States 12 is DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner is granted sixty (60) days to file a reply to the Government's Response in Opposition to Petitioners § 2255 motion, up to and including Tuesday, October 11, 2016. ( Response to Court due by 10/11/2016.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/9/16. (KKS)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of movants § 2255 motion to the Office of the Public Defender for the Eastern District of Missouri. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Public Defende r shall notify this Court, within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, whether it will be pursuing movants arguments under Johnson, either by filing a written notice in this action of their intent not to represent movant , or by filing an amended motion to vacate, brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255, also in this action, or a request in the Court of Appeals for leave to bring a successive § 2255 motion, as required by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b) (3). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movants motion for leave to file a supporting memorandum [Doc. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movants motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 3] is DENIED as moot, because there is no fee for filing a fe deral habeas corpus action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that movants motion for transcripts [Doc. 4] is DENIED, without prejudice, pending the Federal Defenders review of this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court shall hold this matter in abeyance for forty-five (45) days. (copy of motion sent to FPD) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/24/2016. (KMS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?