Hankins v. Anderson et al
Plaintiff: |
Ronnie Hankins |
Defendant: |
Philip Anderson, Melanie Hankle, Diane Montgomery, Terry Russell, Unknown Chishko, Unknown Hawanchak, Troy Steele, Leann Crews, Justin Cavins, Brian Camdam, Unknown Webb and Unknown LaPlant |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv00239 |
Filed: |
February 22, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Francois |
Presiding Judge: |
Henry Edward Autrey |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 25, 2019 |
Filing
84
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, either pay the $505 appellate filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal with a certified copy of his prisoner account statement.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall send plaintiff a copy of the prisoner in forma pauperis form. Response to Court due by 5/25/2019. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/25/19. Form mailed.(CLA)
|
March 29, 2019 |
Filing
77
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 62] is GRANTED and Plaintiffs Motion for Summary Judgment [Doc. No. 65] is DENIED.A separate Judgment in accordance with this Opinion, Memorandum and Order is entered this same date. 62 65 Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 3/29/19. (CLA)
|
May 16, 2016 |
Filing
11
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion for leave to file an amended complaint [ECF No. 10] is DENIED without prejudice. 10 . Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 5/16/16. (CLA)
|
April 12, 2016 |
Filing
7
OPINION MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendants Leann Crews and CO II Unknown Webb. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining defendants are dismissed. An Order of Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/12/16. (KJS)
|
February 29, 2016 |
Filing
4
OPINION, MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $5 within thirty (30) days of the da te of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an o riginal proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a prisoner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must file an amended complaint no later than twenty-eight (28) days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff does not comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. (Mailed prisoner civil rights complaint form, along with a copy of this order, to plaintiff.) Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 2/29/16. (KJS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?