Maybin v. Corizon Healthcare et al
Plaintiff: |
William B. Maybin |
Defendant: |
Corizon Healthcare, John Schaeffer and William McKenney |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv00525 |
Filed: |
April 15, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
Washington |
Presiding Judge: |
Carol E. Jackson |
Nature of Suit: |
Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
October 10, 2017 |
Filing
78
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $1.00 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an appellate proceeding. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/10/17. (KXS)
|
October 2, 2017 |
Filing
77
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel 76 is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 10/2/17. (CAR)
|
August 4, 2017 |
Filing
64
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint motion of the defendants for summary judgment [Doc. # 41 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs motion for injunctive relief [Doc. # 13 ] is denied. A judgment in accordance with this Memorandum and Order will be entered separately. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 8/4/2017. (CLO)
|
October 21, 2016 |
Filing
17
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel (Docket No. 14 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to issue process or cause process to issue on the amended complaint as to Corizon Healthcare in its official capacity and as to Dr. William McKenney in his individual capacity, pursuant to the service agreement with Corizon. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 10/21/2016. (CLO)
|
July 26, 2016 |
Filing
12
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff=s motion for additional time to file an amended complaint and for preliminary injunctive relief [Doc. 8 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/26/16. (JAB)
|
June 20, 2016 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. 2] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall pay an initial filing fee of $12.74 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall submit an amended complaint, in accordance with the instructions set forth in this memorandum and order, on or before July 20, 2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the court shall mail to plaintiff a blank form for the filing of a civil rights complaint. Plaintiff may request additional forms from the Clerk, as needed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [Doc. 4] is denied, without prejudice. (copy or order and form mailed to plaintiff). Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 6/20/2016. (KMS)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?