Norwood-Redfield Apartments Limited Partnership v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Norwood-Redfield Apartments Limited Partnership
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2016cv00639
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 101 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion in Limine to Bar Attorneys' Fees Testimony Offered by Plaintiff is DENIED in part without prejudice to reassertion after Plaintiff's evidence on this issue is admitt ed; however, RULING IS RESERVED as to any opinion testimony offered by Plaintiff on the issue of attorneys' fees, pending Plaintiff's demonstration, prior to trial, that such testimony was sufficiently disclosed during discovery. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on June 20, 2018. (BRP)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 94 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : Upon review of the record and following the final pretrial conference in this case held on the record on June 13, 2018, and for the reasons stated more fully on the open record, the Court sets forth its rulings on the parties motions in limine, as follows: 1. Defendants Motion in Limine to Exclude Expert Testimony Offered by Plaintiff (ECF 70 ): GRANTED in part, to the extent that Plaintiff will be precluded from offering opinion testimony by Joseph Caulfield based on Plaintiffs failure to properly and timely disclose such opinions, and for the further reasons stated on the record; and DENIED as moot in part as to Herbert Baumann, based on Plaintiffs representation on the record that it does not intend to offer opinion testimony by Mr. Baumann. [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS]. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 06/13/2018. (KCB)
April 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 90 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Enforce the Case Management Order is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set forth above. ECF No. 69 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Determine Its Response to Request for Admissions Timely or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time is GRANTED as set forth above. ECF No. 76 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on April 3, 2018. (BRP)
February 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is DENIED. ECF No. 47 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 2/6/18. (NEP)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 53 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER...IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to strike is DENIED. ECF No. 50 . IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs response to Defendant's motion for partial summary judgment shall be due within 14 days of the date of this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/22/2017. (NEB)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants motion for partial summary judgment [Doc. # 26 ] is granted. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/18/17. (JAB)
May 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : 31 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to strike [Doc. #31] is denied.. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/11/17. (KKS)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norwood-Redfield Apartments Limited Partnership v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norwood-Redfield Apartments Limited Partnership
Represented By: Nicholas A. Franke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Meghan E. Lewis
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?