Jamerson v. Williams et al

Plaintiff: Michael C. Jamerson
Defendant: John Williams
Case Number: 4:2016cv00760
Filed: May 27, 2016
Court: Missouri Eastern District Court
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Franklin
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 27, 2016 42 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint [ECF No. 39 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' motions to dismiss [ECF Nos. 33 , 36 ] are DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/27/2016. (CLO)
October 13, 2016 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for discovery [ECF No. 28 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 10/13/2016. (CLO)
August 19, 2016 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to file an amended complaint [ECF No. 16 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve defendants George Lombardi (Missouri Department of Co rrections) and Julie Phipps (Corizon, Inc.) with process. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's claims against Corizon, Inc., are DISMISSED- without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/19/16. (KKS)
July 22, 2016 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendant John Williams. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Corizon, Inc., and the Missouri Department of Corrections are DISMISSED without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/22/2016. (CLO)
June 6, 2016 4 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $22 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant Missouri Department of Corrections is DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send plaintiff a prisoner civil rights complaint form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plainti ff must file an amended complaint within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to comply with this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further proceedings. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. (copy of order and forms mailed to plaintiff). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/6/2016. (KMS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jamerson v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael C. Jamerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?