Crayton v. USA
Petitioner: |
Fredrick K. Crayton |
Respondent: |
USA |
Case Number: |
4:2016cv00833 |
Filed: |
June 10, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri |
Office: |
St. Louis Office |
County: |
St. Louis - City |
Presiding Judge: |
Audrey G. Fleissig |
Nature of Suit: |
Motions to Vacate Sentence |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 2255 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
November 20, 2019 |
Filing
20
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Fredrick Crayton's motion for relief from judgment is DENIED. ECF No. 18 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 11/20/2019. (AFC)
|
March 8, 2017 |
Filing
13
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner Fredrick Crayton's motion filed under 28 U.S.C. § 2255 to vacate, set aside, or correct his sentence is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this Court will not issue a Certificate o f Appealability as Petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a federal constitutional right as required by 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2). A separate Judgment shall accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on March 8, 2017. (BRP)
|
August 31, 2016 |
Filing
5
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Public Defender must notify the Court no later than Tuesday, September 20, 2016, whether it intends to represent movant on this matter. ( Response to Court due by 9/20/2016.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 08/31/2016. (KCB)
|
June 17, 2016 |
Filing
4
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to forward a copy of movants § 2255 motion to the Office of the Public Defender for the Eastern District of Missouri. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Public Defende r shall notify this Court, within forty-five (45) days of the date of this Memorandum and Order, whether it will be pursuing movants arguments under Johnson, either by filing a written notice in this action of their intent not to represent movant, or by filing an amended motion to vacate, brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2255, also in this action, or a request in the Court of Appeals for leave to bring a successive § 2255 motion, as required by 28 U.S.C. § 2244(b)(3). IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that the Court shall hold this matter in abeyance for fortyfive (45) days. (A certified copy of the Memorandum and Order hand delivered to the Office of the Public Defenders.) Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 06/17/2016. (KCB)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?