Somlar v. Nelnet Inc.
Plaintiff: Stuart Somlar
Defendant: Nelnet Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv01037
Filed: June 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion to dismiss is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 21 .) Plaintiffs complaint will be DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 01/04/2017. (KCB)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants motion to set aside the Clerks Entry of Default [ECF No. 12 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion for default judgment [ECF No. 9 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 09/14/2016. (KCB)
August 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on CT Corporation System, 5601 South 59th Street, Lincoln, NE 68516. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Court will hold plaintiffs motion for default judgment in abeyance pending the resolution of this matter. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 08/31/2016. (A copy of this Memorandum and Order mailed by USPS to CT Corporation System, 5601 South 59th Street, Lincoln, NE 68516.) (KCB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Somlar v. Nelnet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stuart Somlar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nelnet Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?