Rogers v. Brouk et al
Plaintiff: Corey Jemell Rogers
Defendant: Steven Brouk, John Layton and Donald Hale
Case Number: 4:2016cv01088
Filed: July 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Phelps
Presiding Judge: Stephen N. Limbaugh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal [ECF No. 74] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $1 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that the remittance is for an original proceeding. Dated ( Initial Partial Filing Fee due by 11/24/2017.) Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 10/24/2017. (JMC)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendants' motion for summary judgment (#55) is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/4/2017. (JMC)
February 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 48 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's Motion for Court-Appointed Counsel (#42) and plaintiff's Motion to Compel (#44) are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 2/13/2017. (JMC)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for the Court to Order Defendants to Submit Copies of Their Deposition Transcripts to Plaintiff is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for the Court to Order t he Defendants and their Counsel to Return to the Plaintiff Original Documents Sent With Initial Disclosures [#26], Plaintiff's Motion to take Recorded Depositions of Non-Party Staff Witnesses and All Defendants [#27], Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to Order Potosi or Their Agent to Allow Plaintiff to Review Video and the Use of Force Report [#29], and Plaintiff's Motion for the Court to Order the Defendants to Produce Documents [#35] are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 1/9/2017. (JMC)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF 16] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 11/22/2016. (JMC)
August 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's request for a temporary restraining order [ECF No. 10] and motion to waive the partial initial filing fee [ECF No. 9] are DENIED. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/19/2016. (JMC)
August 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Plaintiff Corey Jemell Rogers. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for appointment of counsel [ECF No.3] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 8/2/16. (CSG)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. Brouk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Corey Jemell Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Brouk
Represented By: Joel A. Poole(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Layton
Represented By: Joel A. Poole(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Hale
Represented By: Joel A. Poole(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?