Prime Aid Pharmacy Corp v. Express Scripts, Inc.
Plaintiff: Prime Aid Pharmacy Corp
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2016cv01237
Filed: July 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: Within US but Outside District
Presiding Judge: Carol E. Jackson
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 12 U.S.C. ยง 2615
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 139 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to defendant to provide unredacted responses to its first and second sets of requests for production of documents [Doc. # 87 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/27/17. (JAB)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 136 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiffs motion to compel compliance with subpoena duces tecum [Doc. # 65 ] is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, not later than August 14, 2017, Accredo shall produc e documents responsive to the subpoena as set forth above, with the exception of information contained within patient files, which shall be produced within 15 days of Accredo receiving patient names from plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/24/17. (JAB)
July 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel responses to its second set of requests for production of documents [Doc. # 61 ] is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, not later than July 25, 2017, defendant shall produce all documents responsive to plaintiff's second requests for production as set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants motion for hearing [Doc. # 72 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 7/10/2017. (CLO)
May 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to dismiss defendant's first amended counterclaim [Doc. # 92 ] is granted in part and denied in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant's counterclaim for fraud ulent inducement (Count I) is dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the defendant's counterclaim for breach of contract (Count II) is dismissed with respect to all claims except that Prime Aid failed to reverse claims and retained monies to which it was not entitled. 85 , 75 . Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 5/12/17. (KKS)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's consent motion to consolidate the actions [Doc. # 103 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Prime Aid Pharmacy Corp. v. Express Scripts, Inc., 4:17-CV-1001 (DDN) is consolidated with Prime Aid Pharmacy Corp. v. Express Scripts, Inc., 4:16-CV-1237 (CEJ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that henceforth all pleadings and other documents in this matter shall be filed in Prime Aid Pharmacy Corp. v. Express Scripts, Inc., 4:16-CV-1237 (CEJ). See E.D.Mo. L.R. 4.03 ("Following consolidation, all documents shall be filed only in the lowest-numbered case.").. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 4/4/17. (KKS)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that defendant's motion to dismiss [Doc. # 44 ] is denied. Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 1/18/2017. (CLO)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to compel responses to document requests 7-8 and 10-11 [Doc. # 51 ] is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant shall produce all documents responsive to plaintiff's requests for production not later than January 31, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendant's motion for a hearing [Doc. # 57 ] is denied as moot. ( Response to Court due by 1/31/2017.) Signed by District Judge Carol E. Jackson on 01/06/2017. (CLO)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Prime Aid Pharmacy Corp v. Express Scripts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Aid Pharmacy Corp
Represented By: Kevin F. Hormuth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah C. Hellmann
Represented By: Kyle P. Seelbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?