Zell v. Suttle et al

Plaintiff: Eileen L. Zell
Defendant: David Dale Suttle, Michael Mindlin and Elizabeth Kurila
Case Number: 4:2016cv01293
Filed: August 6, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: Audrey G. Fleissig
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Michael Mindlin and Elizabeth Kurila's renewed motion to transfer is DENIED. ECF No. 28 . Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 4/5/18. (KXS)
March 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion to clarify is GRANTED in part, as set forth above. ECF No. 25 . Any motion for leave to amend the complaint in the manner discussed in Plaintiffs motion shall be filed no later than March 19, 2018, and shall include as an attachment the proposed amended complaint. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on 3/7/2018. (NEP)
November 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Michael Mindlin and Elizabeth Kurila's motion to dismiss under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) is GRANTED, and their alternative motion to transfer pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § ; 1404 (a) is DENIED as moot. (Doc. No. 4 .) IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's complaint against Defendant David Dale Suttle is DISMISSED without prejudice, for lack of timely service. A separate Order of Dismissal will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Audrey G. Fleissig on November 15, 2016. (BRP)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zell v. Suttle et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen L. Zell
Represented By: Jonathan Roger Zell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Dale Suttle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Mindlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth Kurila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?