Ervin v. Bowersox
Petitioner: Jonathan T. Ervin
Respondent: Michael Bowersox
Case Number: 4:2016cv01337
Filed: August 17, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: New Madrid
Presiding Judge: E. Richard Webber
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER. The Court finds that Movant has made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, as is required before a certificate of appealability can issue. See Cox v. Norris, 133 F.3d 565, 569 (8th Cir. 1997) (explaining that a " substantial showing" is a showing that the "issues are debatable among reasonable jurists, a court could resolve the issues differently, or the issues deserve further proceedings"). Therefore, the Court will issue a certificate of app ealability as to the claim the trial court erred in admitting evidence of Petitioner's interview with law enforcement. The Court will not issue a certificate of appealability as to Petitioners claim his trial counsel was ineffective for failing to question his father and stepbrother about his father's practice of physically disciplining his children. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 4/11/2017. (CBL)
February 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall forward to petitioner a form "Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Affidavit in Support -- Habeas Cases." IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitione r shall have thirty (30) days from the date of this order either to submit a completed form "Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis and Affidavit in Support -- Habeas Cases." IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if petitioner fails to properly complet e and submit the form motion and affidavit within thirty (30) days, the Court will deny petitioners motion without prejudice. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 2/23/2017. (IFP Habeas form emailed to Attorney for Petitioner this date.)(CBL)
January 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Petitioner Jonathan T. Ervin's Petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody [ECF No. 1] is DENIED.Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on January 18, 2017. (MCB)
November 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Petitioner Jonathan T. Ervin's Petition under 28 U.S.C. § 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody [ECF No. 1 ] is DENIED. Signed by District Judge E. Richard Webber on 11/21/2016. (CBL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ervin v. Bowersox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan T. Ervin
Represented By: Kevin L. Schriener
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Bowersox
Represented By: Andrew Jacob Crane(Designation State / Local Government)
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke(Designation State / Local Government)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?