Cohen v. Corizon Medical et al
Plaintiff: Donald Cohen
Defendant: Corizon Medical, Charles Chastain, Unknown Chein and Medical Device Supplier
Case Number: 4:2016cv01343
Filed: August 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Francois
Presiding Judge: Catherine D. Perry
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's claims in his amended complaint against defendant Chastain, in his individual capacity, under the Eighth Amendment, are properly alleged pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff's claims in his complaint against defendant Corizon are dismissed, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(e)(2)(B). An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 2/16/2017. (CBL)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendant Dr. Charles Chastain in his official and individual capacity. Service shall be effectuated at the address p rovided by Corizon in its Response to the Court Pursuant to its Waiver Agreement. [Doc. #10] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that because plaintiff is proceeding in forma pauperis in this action, service shall be effectuated by the United States Marshal' ;s Office through summons, pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4. See 28 U.S.C. § 1915. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a copy of the summons and the return of summons shall be filed under seal and will not be served upon plaintiff, as these documents will contain defendant Chastains last known home address. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on November 22, 2016. (MCB)
October 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER (See Full Order). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. # 2 ] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $1.90 within thirty (30) d ays of the date of this Order. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to "Clerk, United States District Court," and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) that th e remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to serve process on defendants Corizon, Inc., and Dr. Charles Chastain pursuant to the service agreement the Court maintains with Corizon, Inc. Corizon s hall be served in its official capacity only. Dr. Chastain shall be served in both his official and individual capacity. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Dr. Unknown Chein and Medical Device Supplier are DISMISSED without prejudice. An Order of Partial Dismissal will be filed separately. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 10/11/16. (EAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cohen v. Corizon Medical et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Chastain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unknown Chein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Device Supplier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?