Whitley v. Bowersox
Petitioner: D'Andre Whitley
Respondent: Michael Bowersox
Case Number: 4:2016cv01537
Filed: September 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - City
Presiding Judge: John M. Bodenhausen
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that petitioners "Objection to the Magistrate Judge's Recommended Disposition," deemed to be a motion for reconsideration Doc. # 24 , is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 6/11/19. (ARL)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the petition of DAndre Whitley for writ of habeas corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 [Doc. # 1 ] is denied. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no certificate of appealability will be issued, because petitioner has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. See 28 U.S.C. § 2253(c)(2); Miller-El v. Cockrell, 123 S. Ct. 1029, 1040 (2003) (standard for issuing a certificate of appealability). A separate Judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 5/7/2019. (NEP)
June 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re: 14 PRO SE MOTION release on bail from the DOC pending disposition of habeas petition filed by Petitioner D'Andre Whitley motion is DENIED.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 6/9/17. (LGK)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to mail petitioner a copy of the Court's motion to proceed in forma pauperis habeas cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner must either pay the $5 filing fee or submit a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John M. Bodenhausen on 9/29/16. (ARL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitley v. Bowersox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: D'Andre Whitley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Bowersox
Represented By: Stephen D. Hawke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?