Phyllis Schafly Revocable Trust et al v. Cori et al
Plaintiff: Eagle Trust Fund and Phyllis Schlafly Revocable Trust
Defendant: Anne Cori, Eunie Smith, Cathie Adams, Carolyn McLarty, Rosina Kovar, Shirley Curry, Jane or John Doe #1, Jane or John Doe #2, Jane or John Doe #4, Jane or John Doe #5 and Jane or John Doe #3
Case Number: 4:2016cv01631
Filed: October 19, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Louis - County
Presiding Judge: John A. Ross
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 286 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's motion to strike Plaintiff's expert witnesses is DENIED as MOOT. (Doc. No. 248 ). Defendant may re-file the motion at a later date, if necessary. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/28/23. (JAB)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 275 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Judge Mark D. Seigel is appointed as Special Master to resolve the parties' outstanding discovery issues, including, but not limited to, the parties ESI protocol, any claims of privilege, any outstanding discovery for Phase I of discovery, and any outstanding depositions in this case. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/26/23. (JAB) cc: Finance Dept.
July 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 247 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Quash 243 is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 7/6/22. (JAB)
March 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 239 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER. (See Full Order.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Anne Cori's Motion for Summary Judgment 198 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part, as set forth above. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Eagle Forum's Motion for Summary Judgment 194 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment 201 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a joint proposed scheduling plan within fourteen days. (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 4/11/2022.) Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 3/28/2022. (CBL)
November 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties' consent motion to amend/correct the Case Management Order 204 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' previous joint motion to amend/correct the Case Management Order 191 and the supplemental motion to amend/correct the Case Management Order 192 are DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/4/21. (JAB)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Eagle Forum's motion for protective order 180 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the deadline for the deposition of Defendant Eagle Forum's corporate representative shall be extended to June 16, 2021. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 6/9/2021. (LNJ)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant's Motion to Compel 159 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion for Protective Order 160 is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than February 24, 2021, the parties shall meet and confer and submit to the Court a joint proposed schedule for discovery. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/17/2021. (CLO)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants Motions to Dismiss [140, 142] are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The motions are GRANTED only as to the issue of ownership of eagleforum.org and eagleforum.org email addresses in Count X. The remainder of Count X survives dismissal. The motion is DENIED in all other respects. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/7/2021. (SMM)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Individual Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, (Doc. No. 140 ), is GRANTED in part. All claims asserted against Defendants Cathie Adams, Shirley Curry, Rosina Kovar, Carolyn McLarty, and Eunie S mith are DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the remaining Defendants shall brief the Court on the impact of the Judgment and Order entered September 14, 2020 in Cause No. 2016MR000111 within fifteen days of the date of this order. Plaintiffs shall have ten days to respond. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/3/2020. (SMM)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file a second amended complaint and to add SpearTip as a party is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 135 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' motions to dismiss are DE NIED as moot. (Doc. Nos. 124 , 127 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, given the addition of SpearTip, the case management order is VACATED to be reset upon later instruction by the Court. (Doc. No. 123 ). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 8/12/2020. (CLO)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER / ORDER LIFTING STAY : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Lift Stay is GRANTED. (Doc. No. 110 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay originally entered in this case on November 15, 2017, is HEREBY LIFTED. (Doc. No. 82 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall confer and propose a scheduling plan to the Court on or before May 19, 2020. ( Joint Scheduling Plan due by 5/19/2020.). Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 5/12/20. (KKS)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to lift stay (Doc. No. 101 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that this case shall remain STAYED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before March 24, 2020, Plainti ffs and Defendants shall each file a status report regarding all other related lawsuits. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a notice updating the Court of any judgments entered in the Madison County or St. Louis County probate case within ten (10) days of the entry of judgment. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 1/24/20. (JAB)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this matter is STAYED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall submit a report advising the Court of the status of related cases every six (6) months or within ten (10) days of any final judgment or ruling on a dispositive motion. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the clerk of the Court shall administratively close this case. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/15/17. (JAB)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 81 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to compel (Doc. 77 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 9/26/17. (JAB)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (Doc. 45 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court shall detach and docket Plaintiffs proposed amended complaint which was submitted as an attachmen t to the Motion (Doc. 45.2). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Motion to Dismiss or, in the Alternative, for Stay (Doc. 16 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Second Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order an d Preliminary Injunction (Doc. 46 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Substitute Corrected Exhibit and to Seal (Doc. 25 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as follows. The motion is GRANTED to the extent i t seeks to seal Exhibits 2 and 7 attached to Plaintiffs First Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order (Docs. 7.2, 7.7-7.13), and the motion is DENIED to the extent is seeks to substitute Exhibit A attached to the Motion for Leave to Substitute C orrect Exhibit and to Seal for Exhibit 7 attached to Plaintiffs First Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. The Clerk shall seal Exhibits 2 and 7 attached to Plaintiffs First Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Docs. 7.2, 7.7-7.13). IT IS FI NALLY ORDERED that the parties shall show cause, in writing and no later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, why this proceeding should not be stayed pending the resolution of the Madison County case and the St. Louis County Probate case. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 4/17/17. (JAB)
February 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Strike or Exclude the Declaration of John Schlafly (Doc. No. 18 ) is DENIED as moot.. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 2/3/17. (JAB)
December 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Schedule Rule 16 Conference (Doc. No. 42 ) is DENIED without prejudice. The Court will consider any scheduling matters under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 pending its resolution of Defendant's Motion. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 12/13/16. (JAB)
November 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs emergency motion for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction (Doc. No. 7 ) is DENIED. Signed by District Judge John A. Ross on 11/9/16. (JAB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phyllis Schafly Revocable Trust et al v. Cori et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle Trust Fund
Represented By: Jennifer E. Hoekel
Represented By: Jessica M. Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phyllis Schlafly Revocable Trust
Represented By: Jennifer E. Hoekel
Represented By: Jessica M. Mendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Cori
Represented By: Eric David Block
Represented By: Arthur David Gregg
Represented By: Richard D. Lageson
Represented By: Megan D. Meadows
Represented By: Erik O. Solverud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eunie Smith
Represented By: Eric David Block
Represented By: Arthur David Gregg
Represented By: Richard D. Lageson
Represented By: Megan D. Meadows
Represented By: Erik O. Solverud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathie Adams
Represented By: Eric David Block
Represented By: Arthur David Gregg
Represented By: Richard D. Lageson
Represented By: Megan D. Meadows
Represented By: Erik O. Solverud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn McLarty
Represented By: Eric David Block
Represented By: Arthur David Gregg
Represented By: Richard D. Lageson
Represented By: Megan D. Meadows
Represented By: Erik O. Solverud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosina Kovar
Represented By: Eric David Block
Represented By: Arthur David Gregg
Represented By: Richard D. Lageson
Represented By: Megan D. Meadows
Represented By: Erik O. Solverud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Curry
Represented By: Eric David Block
Represented By: Arthur David Gregg
Represented By: Richard D. Lageson
Represented By: Megan D. Meadows
Represented By: Erik O. Solverud
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane or John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane or John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane or John Doe #4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane or John Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane or John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?