French v. Central Credit Services, et al
Plaintiff: Joseph Lamont French
Defendant: Central Credit Services, Integrity Solution Services and Radius Global Services
Case Number: 4:2016cv01654
Filed: October 24, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Office: St. Louis Office
County: St. Charles
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L. White
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (ECF No. 81 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (ECF No. 85 ) is DENIED. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Strike (ECF No. 97 ) is DENIED as MOOT. A separate Judgment will accompany this Memorandum and Order. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on June 7, 2018. (BRP)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Central Credit Services, LLC's Motion to Compel Plaintiffs Responses to Written Discovery Including Medical Records Authorization (ECF No. 43 ) is DENIED as MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERE D that Plaintiff's Motion for Sanctions of Ogletree Deakins & Sessions Fishman Nathan & Israel for Infringement of Rights and Discovery Abuses (ECF No. 49 ) and Plaintiffs Amended Motion for Sanctions of Ogletree Deakins & Sessions Fishman Nathan & Israel for Infringement of Rights and Discovery Abuses (ECF No. 54 ) are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on September 12, 2017. (BRP)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall meet and confer in compliance with E.D. Mo. L.R. 3.04. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Cami will hold Defendant's motion to compel in abeyance pending a statement from the Defe ndant indicating that it has conferred in person or by telephone with pro se Plaintiff in good faith or has made reasonable efforts to do so, along with a statement containing the date, time and manner of such conference or a statement regarding the efforts made to confer with pro se Plaintiff.. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 08/08/2017. (KCB)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Docket Text Order dated July 26, 2017 [ECF No. 56 ] is VACATED and Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Serve Subpoenas for Deponents to Appear at a Deposition is DENIED for failure to comply wit h Fed. R. Civ. P. 45. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall issue to Plaintiff six blank Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action forms. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that if Plaintiff submits a request for service by the Uni ted States Marshals Service, Plaintiff must also submit a memorandum demonstrating the relevance and materiality of the information requested, the necessity of the particular testimony to prove Plaintiffs case for each proposed deponent, and how he will provide the necessary costs related to the depositions. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 7/28/2017. (NEB) (6 Subpoenas Issued and mailed to Plaintiff.)
July 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 51 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion to Amend Civil Action to Add Missouri Human Right Acts Claims under the Supplemental Jurisdiction Statute (ECF No. 38 ) is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Court Order of Jeanne Hawkins' Tax Transcripts (ECF No. 37 ) is DENIED as MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Compel Responses to Discovery (ECF No. 47 ) is GRANTED to and including July 24, 2017. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on July 20, 2017. (BRP)
November 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (Docket No. 2 ) is granted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to appoint counsel (Docket No. 4) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall cause process to issue upon the complaint as to all defendants via their Registered Agent, C T Corporation System, 120 South Central A venue, Clayton, MO 63105. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on November 1, 2016. (BRP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: French v. Central Credit Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Lamont French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Credit Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Integrity Solution Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radius Global Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?